19 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MC 7F | Hatches Creek | Di Tomo, Ernano | | | | 15 Sep 1964 - 09 Mar 1965 |
| item | MC 8F | Kurundi | Geopeko Ltd | | | | 18 Sep 1964 - 01 Oct 1964 |
| item | MC 9F | Kurundi | Geopeko Ltd | | | | 18 Sep 1964 - 01 Oct 1964 |
| item | MC 10F | Kurundi | Geopeko Ltd | | | | 18 Sep 1964 - 01 Oct 1964 |
| item | MC 11F | Kurundi | Peko Mines N/L | | | | 28 Apr 1965 - 10 Dec 1965 |
| item | MC 12F | Elkedra Station | Bell, Norman Crighton | | | | 31 May 1965 - 10 Dec 1965 |
| item | MC 13F | Barrow Creek | Joswig, Winfried LW; Del Torre, Luciano; Pegoraro, Giovanni | | | | 27 Jan 1970 - 13 Jul 1971 |
| item | MC 13F | Kurinelli Windmill | Gold and Mineral Exploration No Liability | | | | 30 Aug 1972 - 17 Jan 1973 |
| item | MC 14F | Barrow Creek | Joswig, Winfried LW; Del Torre, Luciano; Pegoraro, Giovanni | | | | 27 Jan 1970 - 13 Jul 1971 |
| item | MC 16F | Barrow Creek | Colson, Allan Dale; Petrick, Erich William; Mengel, Arthur John; Petrick, Jose Amelia | | | | 31 Oct 1974 - 17 Jan 1975 |
| item | MC 17F | Barrow Creek | Colson, Allan Dale; Petrick, Erich William; Mengel, Arthur John; Petrick, Jose Amelia; Jabiard, Peter Ara on behalf of Tara Community | | | | 12 Dec 1974 - 02 Apr 1976 |
| item | MC 18F | Taylor's Well [Triple Black No.1] | Mason, Harry | | | | 09 Aug 1976 - 27 Feb 1978 |
| item | MC 19F | Taylor's Well [Triple Black No.2] | Mason, Harry | | | | 09 Aug 1976 - 27 Feb 1978 |
| item | MC 20F | Taylor's Well [Triple Black No.3] | Mason, Harry | | | | 09 Aug 1976 - 27 Feb 1978 |
| item | MC 21F | Taylor's Well [Triple Black No.4] | Mason, Harry | | | | 09 Aug 1976 - 27 Feb 1978 |
| item | MC 23F | Wauchope | Sickerdick, Raymond Otto | | | | 26 Apr 1973 - 24 May 1979 |
| item | MC 24F | Wauchope | Sickerdick, Raymond Otto | | | | 26 Apr 1973 - 28 Jun 1977 |
| item | MC 26F | Wauchope | Polyak, Alexander | | | | 12 Jul 1977 - 11 Sep 1978 |