193 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0207 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1700 Part 1, International Mining Corporation NL, 4 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 05 Aug 1977 - 05 Mar 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0209 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1701, International Mining Corporation NL, 4 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 05 Aug 1977 - 24 Aug 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0210 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1769, Harold Brennan, James Weir, 5 Square Miles, Daly Waters | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 01 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0211 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1770, Roy Barden, Arthur Parker, Dennis Campbell, 25.63 Square Miles, Fergusson River | | | | | 24 Feb 1978 - 09 Nov 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0212 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1771, Alcoa of Australia Limited, 374 Square Miles, Rodinga | | | | | 01 Mar 1978 - 20 Jun 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0213 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1772, Alcoa of Australia Limited, 295 Square Miles, Hale River | | | | | 01 Mar 1978 - 05 Jan 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0214 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1774, William Robert MacNeill, 31.4 Square Miles, South of Smith Gift Bore | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0215 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1775, William Robert MacNeill, 174.84 Square Miles, North of Mount Harris | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0216 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1776, William T Knox, 497.62 Square Miles, David Bore | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0217 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1777, William Robert MacNeill, 464.09 Square Miles, Narwietooma | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0218 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1778, William Robert MacNeill, 189.76 Square Miles, Karanji Bore | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0219 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1779, William Robert MacNeill, 343.16 Square Miles, Stuart Range | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0220 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1780, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 492.75 Square Miles, Munyu Hills | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 26 Jul 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0221 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1781, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 492.75 Square Miles, Jangga Bluff | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 10 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0222 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1782, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 496.62 Square Miles, False Mount Russell | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 10 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0223 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1783, William Robert MacNeill, 464.67 Square Miles, Mount Feeling | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0224 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1784, Micheal Paul Noaks, 11.52 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 28 Mar 1978 - 08 Nov 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0225 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1785, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Mount Russell | | | | | 01 Feb 1978 - 25 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0226 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1786, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Mount Ruby | | | | | 01 Feb 1978 - 25 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0227 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1787, Australian Diamond Exploration, 494 Square Miles, Murchison Range | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 30 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0228 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1788, Australian Diamond Exploration, 8 Square Miles, Mosquito Creek | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 18 Jul 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0229 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1789, Australian Diamond Exploration, 38 Square Miles, Mount Fisher | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0230 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1790, Australian Diamond Exploration, 48 Square Miles, Munadgee Creek | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 18 Jul 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0231 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1791, Australian Diamond Exploration, 92 Square Miles, Wycliffe Creek | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0232 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1792, Australian Diamond Exploration, 440 Square Miles, Davenport Range | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0233 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1793, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Rockhold Creek | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0234 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1794, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Whisky Camp | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 18 Jul 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0235 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1795, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Elkedra River | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 18 Jul 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0236 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1796, Australian Diamond Exploration, 190 Square Miles, Kintore Range | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 18 Jul 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0237 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1797, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Burt Plain | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0238 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1798, Australian Diamond Exploration, 200 Square Miles, Mount Russell | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 04 Jul 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0239 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1799, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Mount Laughlen | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0240 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1800, Australian Diamond Exploration, 500 Square Miles, Mount Johnston | | | | | 16 Mar 1978 - 17 Nov 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0241 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1801 Part 1, Hillrise Properties Pty Ltd, 500 Square Miles, Illogwa Creek | | | | | 03 Mar 1978 - 28 Aug 1981 |
3 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0243 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1802, Hillrise Properties Pty Ltd, Alice Springs | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 19 May 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0244 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1803, Amoco Minerals Australia Company, Bauhinia Downs | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 07 Feb 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0245 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1804 Part 1, Australian Ores Minerals Limited, Tennant Creek | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 21 Oct 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0247 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1805, Essex Minerals Company, The Granites | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 27 Jul 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0248 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1806, Jingellic Minerals NL, Alligator River | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 12 Sep 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0249 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1807, Jingellic Minerals NL, Alligator River | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 08 Aug 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0250 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1808, Inomotivator Inc Company, Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 03 Oct 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0251 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1809, Inomotivator Inc Company, Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 11 Oct 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0252 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1810, Inomotivator Inc Company, Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 06 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0253 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1811, Inomotivator Inc Company, Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 07 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0254 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1812, Inomotivator Inc Company, Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve, Mount Evelyn | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 07 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0255 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1813, Inomotivator Inc Company, Darwin | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 18 Sep 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0256 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1814, Inomotivator Inc Company, Darwin | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 03 Oct 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0257 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1815, The Shell Company of Australia Limited, Bauhinia Downs | | | | | 02 Apr 1978 - 29 Sep 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0258 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1816, CRA Exploration Pty Ltd, Bauhinia Downs | | | | | 02 Apr 1978 - 07 Feb 1979 |
4 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0259 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1822, Inomotivator Inc Company, Tennant Creek | | | | | 17 Apr 1978 - 19 Aug 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0260 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1821, Inomotivator Inc Company, Darwin | | | | | 15 Apr 1978 - 17 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0261 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1820, Inomotivator Inc Company, Tennant Creek | | | | | 17 Apr 1978 - 29 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0262 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1819, Inomotivator Inc Company, Tennant Creek | | | | | 17 Apr 1978 - 29 Aug 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0263 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1823, Michael Paul Noaks, Pine Creek | | | | | 17 Apr 1978 - 10 Dec 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0264 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1824, William T Knox, Napperby | | | | | 21 Apr 1978 - 29 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0265 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1825, William T Knox, Napperby | | | | | 21 Apr 1978 - 29 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0266 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1831, Harold Brennan, James Weir, Daly Waters | | | | | 23 Feb 1978 - 23 Feb 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0267 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1832, AO (Australia) Pty Ltd, Fergusson River | | | | | 28 Apr 1978 - 26 Sep 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0268 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1833, Denison Mines Company Canada, The Granites | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 07 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0269 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1834, Denison Mines Company Canada, The Granites | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 19 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0270 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1835, Denison Mines Company Canada, The Granites | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 19 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0271 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1836, Denison Mines Company Canada, The Granites | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 19 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0272 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1837, Denison Mines Company Canada, The Granites | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 19 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0273 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1838, William T Knox, Birrindudu | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 28 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0274 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1839, William T Knox, Birrindudu | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 26 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0275 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1840, William T Knox, Birrindudu | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 26 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0276 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1841, William T Knox, Birrindudu | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 26 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0277 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1842, William T Knox, Tanami | | | | | 03 May 1978 - 26 Jul 1978 |
5 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0278 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1843, William T Knox, Tanami | | | | | 02 Apr 1978 - 03 May 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0279 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1844, William T Knox, Tanami | | | | | 02 Apr 1978 - 03 May 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0280 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1845, Euralba Mining Limited, Fergusson River | | | | | 02 Apr 1978 - 25 Jun 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0281 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Authority to Prospect, AP2820 Part 2, Pechiney (Australia) Exploration Pty Limited, 4180 Square Miles, Towns River | | | | | 29 Apr 1970 - 25 Oct 1971 |
| item | MT1978/0282 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Authority to Prospect, AP2331 Part 2, Australian Ores, Minerals Pty Limited, 840 Square Miles, Limmen Bight River | | | | | 03 Apr 1969 - 21 May 1970 |
| item | MT1978/0283 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1846, Alcoa of Australia Limited, Hale River | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 23 Jul 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0284 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1847 Part 1, Baroid Australia Pty Limited, Delamere | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 28 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0286 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1848, Baroid Australia Pty Limited, Fergusson River | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 21 Mar 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0287 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1849, Australia Ores, Minerals Ltd, Shell Minerals Exploration (Australia) Pty Ltd, Peko Exploration, Tennant Creek | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 09 Mar 1984 |
6 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0289 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1852, Inomotivator Inc Company, Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 25 May 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0290 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1853, William T Knox, Mount Evelyn | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 03 Oct 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0291 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1854, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, Napperby | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 30 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0292 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1855, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, Mount Doreen | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 13 Oct 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0293 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1856, Uranerz Australia Pty Ltd, Pine Creek | | | | | 18 May 1978 - 01 May 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0294 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1857, Uranerz Australia Pty Ltd, Pine Creek | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 12 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0295 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1858, Uranerz Australia Pty Ltd, Pine Creek | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 12 Feb 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0296 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1859, Uranerz Australia Pty Ltd, Pine Creek | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 12 Feb 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0297 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1860, Alcoa of Australia Limited, Alice Springs | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 06 Jul 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0298 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1861, Alcoa of Australia Limited, Alcoota | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 30 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0299 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1862, Billy Boy Foster, Bonney Well | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 05 Dec 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0300 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1863, Central Pacific Minerals NL, Mount Doreen | | | | | 08 Jun 1978 - 24 May 1982 |
7 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0301 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1864, CSR Limited, 380 Square Miles, Auvergne | | | | | 25 May 1978 - 22 Apr 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0302 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1865, Lindsay Andrew Johannsen, 100 Square Miles, Huckitta | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 24 Sep 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0303 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1867, Dampier Mining Company Limited, 124 Square Miles, Lake Mackay | | | | | 12 Jun 1978 - 10 Nov 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0304 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1868, Dampier Mining Company Limited, 368 Square Miles, Lake Mackay | | | | | 12 Jun 1978 - 10 Nov 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0305 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1869, Dampier Mining Company Limited, 158 Square Miles, Lake Mackay | | | | | 12 Jun 1978 - 10 Nov 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0306 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1870, Dampier Mining Company Limited, 179 Square Miles Lake Mackay | | | | | 12 Jun 1978 - 10 Nov 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0307 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1871, BHP Minerals Limited, 250 Square Miles, Lake Mackay | | | | | 12 Jun 1978 - 20 Oct 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0308 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1872, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 273.01 Square Miles, Katherine | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 09 Feb 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0313 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1877, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 187.05 Square Miles, Tennant Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 09 Dec 1984 |
| item | MT1978/0314 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1878, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 460.12 Square Miles, Barrow Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 05 Nov 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0315 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1881, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 423.66 Square Miles, Mount Peake | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 08 Nov 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0316 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1882, Peko Exploration Limited, 10.27 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 23 Jun 1978 - 23 Mar 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0317 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1883, BHP Minerals Limited, 43 Square Miles, Lake Mackay | | | | | 23 Jun 1978 - 20 Oct 1982 |
8 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0318 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1884, BHP Minerals Limited, 124 Square Miles, Lake Mackay | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 20 Oct 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0319 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1885, John Cumming, Albert Morton, 63 Square Miles, Elkedra | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 23 Oct 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0320 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1886, Talmina Trading Pty Ltd, Northern Gold NL, 12.7 Square Miles, Bridge Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 24 Apr 1985 |
| item | MT1978/0321 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1887, Chrisp De Vries, Associates Pty Ltd, 8.4 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 08 Sep 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0322 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1889, Triako Mines NL, 477 Square Miles, Alcoota, Alice Springs | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 05 Jan 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0323 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1890, Triako Mines NL, 360 Square Miles, Calvert Hills | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 18 Mar 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0324 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1888, Chrisp De Vries, Associates Pty Ltd, 6 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 30 Jun 1978 - 21 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0325 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1891, Triako Mines NL, 382 Square Miles, Alice Springs | | | | | 28 Jun 1978 - 06 Jan 1981 |
9 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0412 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1818, William Joseph Fisher, John Edward Neate Kempin, 122 Square Miles, Mathison Creek | | | | | 14 Apr 1978 - 19 Apr 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0413 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1866, Eric Bernard Walker, 16 Square Miles, Katherine | | | | | 17 Jun 1978 - 16 Sep 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0414 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1879, CRA Exploration Pty Limited, 368.70 Square Miles, Barrow Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 19 Nov 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0415 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1880, CRA Exploration Pty Ltd, 429.80 Square Miles, Barrow Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1978 - 16 Jun 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0423 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1322B, Rodney James Fullwood, Berre Lorraine Harris, 7 Hectares, Cathamanda | | | | | 16 Jan 1978 - 12 Sep 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0424 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1341B, Darwin Clay Bricks Company, 8.11 Hectares | | | | | 23 May 1978 - 20 Oct 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0425 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1339B, Uranerz Australia Pty Ltd, 508.90 Hectares, Batchelor No 1 | | | | | 17 May 1978 - 27 Aug 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0426 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1344B, Allan A Woods, 40 Acres, Margaret | | | | | 06 Jun 1978 - 19 Jan 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0435 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Gold Mining Leases, GML194B, Ronald Roberts, Gerald Albert Swan, Robert James Rose (Sharon No 1) | | | | | 30 Mar 1978 - 23 Sep 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0488 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Extractive Authority, EA52, Koolomara Company Pty Ltd, 20 Hectares | | | | | 24 Apr 1978 - 02 Oct 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0490 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Extractive Authority, EA77, Daly River Community Development Association | | | | | 30 May 1978 - 08 Nov 1982 |
10 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0493 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1826, Suttons Motors (Darwin) Pty Ltd, 139 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 02 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1987 |
| item | MT1978/0494 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1827, Suttons Motors (Darwin) Pty Ltd, 53 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 02 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1987 |
| item | MT1978/0495 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1828, Suttons Motors (Darwin) Pty Ltd, 16 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 02 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1987 |
| item | MT1978/0496 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1829, Suttons Motors (Darwin) Pty Ltd, 67 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 02 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1987 |
| item | MT1978/0497 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1830, Suttons Motors (Darwin) Pty Ltd, 3 Square Miles, Pine Creek | | | | | 02 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1987 |
| item | MT1978/0503 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease North, MLN444, Geopeko Mines, 16 Hectares, Quest 53 No 7 | | | | | 21 Jun 1978 - 25 Mar 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0504 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease North, MLN445, Geopeko Mines, 16 Hectares, Quest 54 No 3 | | | | | 21 Jun 1978 - 25 Mar 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0505 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease North, MLN446, Geopeko Mines, 16 Hectares, Quest 54 No 4 | | | | | 21 Jun 1978 - 25 Mar 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0506 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease North, MLN447, Geopeko Mines, 16 Hectares, Quest 54 No 5 | | | | | 21 Jun 1978 - 25 Mar 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0512 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Extractive Authority, EA51, Koolamara Company Pty Ltd, 2.523 Hectares, Balbirini | | | | | 21 Apr 1978 - 18 Jan 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0520 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML337F, Helmar Otto Mostler, 40 Acres, Home of Bullion | | | | | 15 Jan 1968 - 22 Aug 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0521 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1429E, Ford Brothers, 15.6 Hectares, Quartz Hill No 3, Tennant Creek | | | | | 17 Mar 1978 - 12 Nov 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0522 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1430E, Ford Brothers, 15.6 Hectares, Quartz Hill No 4 | | | | | 17 Mar 1978 - 08 Apr 1986 |
11 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0524 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML632F, Miller, Albert Victor, 40 Acres, Hill of Leaders, Mosquito Creek, Wolfram | | | | | 10 Apr 1978 - 11 Sep 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0544 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Licence to Treat Tailings, LTT1/78, Australian Development Limited | | | | | 09 Jun 1978 - 07 Aug 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0545 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Licence to Treat Tailings, LTT2/78, McDonald, Alexander Gordon, Remfresy Gordon Stanley | | | | | 29 Jun 1978 - 12 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0549 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC4F, Joe Wills, 5 Acres, Tennant Creek | | | | | 30 Jun 1978 - 02 Dec 1982 |
| item | MT1978/0550 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Garden Area, GA18E, Alexandor Polyak, 10 Acres, Jon Lescait | | | | | 24 Feb 1978 - 24 Feb 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0551 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC27F, Alexandor Polyak, 40 Acres, Jon Lexa | | | | | 28 Jun 1978 - 21 Nov 1983 |
| item | MT1978/0559 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC28A, M Mott, M Wilson, 10 Acres, Pine Creek | | | | | 11 Apr 1978 - 24 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0560 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC101B, John Middelton Sime, 4 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 19 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0561 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC102B, John Arnold, 80 Acres, Pine Creek | | | | | 29 May 1978 - 09 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0564 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1554A, Albert Leonard Booth, 18.8 Hectares, Jessops Tin Mine | | | | | 15 May 1978 - 19 Sep 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0588 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Garden Area, GA79B, Kathleen Mary Jansen, 5 Acres, Adelaide River | | | | | 29 Aug 1978 - 18 Jan 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0590 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC100B, Alfred Morgan Lee, 150 Acres, Mt Wells | | | | | 06 Apr 1978 - 08 Feb 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0591 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC103B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 17 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0592 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC104B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0593 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC105B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 02 Jul 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0594 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC106B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0595 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC107B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0596 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC108B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0597 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC109B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0598 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC110B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0599 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC111B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 02 Jun 1978 - 15 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0600 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dredging Claim, DC112B, James George Heggie, Zdenek Kempny, 290 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 31 May 1978 - 02 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0603 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1555A, Walter Edward Casey, Edward John Vallee, 40 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 29 Jun 1978 - 19 Jan 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0607 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1556A, Walter Edward Casey, Edward John Vallee, 40 Acres, Darwin | | | | | 20 May 1978 - 19 Oct 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0608 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1557A, Sumatra Trading Company Pty Limited, 40 Acres, Adelaide River | | | | | 15 Jun 1978 - 31 Aug 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0610 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1340B, Jacqueline Lesley Hargraves, 15.75 Hectares, Adelaide River | | | | | 01 Mar 1977 - 10 Jan 1979 |
12 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | MT1978/0611 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML1345B, Laurie McIntosh, 16 Hectares, Adelaide River | | | | | 07 Jun 1978 - 08 Feb 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0614 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC756H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 4.5 Hectares, Agna 42 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0615 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC757H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 18.60 Hectares, Agna 43 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0616 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC758H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 16.18 Hectares, Agna 44 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0617 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC759H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 16.18 Hectares, Agna 45 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0618 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC760H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 16.18 Hectares, Agna 46 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0619 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC761H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 16.18 Hectares, Agna 47 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0620 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC762H, Agip Australia Pty Ltd, 22.75 Hectares, Agna 48 | | | | | 13 Apr 1978 - 07 Aug 1980 |
| item | MT1978/0621 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Prospecting Area, PA56A, Anthony Noaks, 3 Acres, Adelaide River | | | | | 23 Jan 1978 - 01 Jun 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0622 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Prospecting Area, PA57A, Sumatra Trading Company Pty Limited, 20 Acres, Mount Wells | | | | | 28 Mar 1978 - 18 Oct 1978 |
| item | MT1978/0638 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Claim, MC770H, Walter Desmond Legg, 7 Acres, Pegg Legg | | | | | 09 May 1978 - 06 Dec 1979 |
| item | MT1978/0744 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Extractive Authority, EA35, Steve Falkers, 9 Hectares, Alice Springs | | | | | 10 Feb 1978 - 26 May 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0745 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1850 Part 1, Baroid Australia Pty Limited, 500 Square Miles, Fergusson River | | | | | 15 May 1978 - 12 Oct 1981 |
| item | MT1978/0747 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL1773, William Robert MacNeill, 58.6 Square Miles | | | | | 06 Mar 1978 - 02 May 1978 |
| item | MT1978/2054 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dealings, D1454, Harold Brennan, Northbridge Mining Proprietary Limited, 5.14 Square Miles | | | | | 03 Apr 1978 - 04 Apr 1978 |
| item | MT1978/2055 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dealings, D1488, Agip Nuclear Australia Pty Ltd, Yuendumu Mining Company NL | | | | | 15 Jun 1978 - 21 Jun 1978 |
| item | MT1978/2056 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Dealings, D1502, Harold Brennan, James Weir, CRA Exploration Pty Limited | | | | | 26 Jun 1978 - 19 Sep 1978 |
| item | MT1978/2064 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Exploration Licence, EL979, Uranerz (Australia) Pty Ltd, 32.62 Square Miles, Hermannsburg, Henbury | | | | | 16 Jun 1978 - 13 Jun 1979 |
| item | MT1977/2008 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML79A Part 2, Mary River, Mingelo Creek, 40 Acres | | | | | 18 Feb 1977 - 11 May 1983 |
| item | MT1977/2009 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease, ML323 Vol 2, John Henry Langley, Rex Abbott, James Frederick Bowditch, John Norman Crago, James Richardson, 17 Acres, David Mine | | | | | 16 Sep 1977 - 09 Sep 1981 |
| item | MT1977/2010 | Mineral Titles, Tenure History, Mineral Lease North, MLN685, Secured Loans, Developments Ltd, 16 Hectares, Osullivans South | | | | | 26 Oct 1977 - 07 Oct 1985 |