51 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | S/C1 | Sims, RR | | | | | 29 Aug 1946 - 09 Jul 1947 |
| item | S/C2 | Trenons, P | | | | | 22 Aug 1946 - 29 Aug 1946 |
| item | S/C3 | Messrs Henry and Bayley | | | | | 29 Aug 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C4 | Crocos, George | | | | | 17 Aug 1946 - 29 Aug 1946 |
| item | S/C5 | Hunt, DS;Tarhanoff, V | | | | | 12 Aug 1946 - 25 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C6 | Bell, CNK; Darwin Silvertop Cabs | | | | | 08 Aug 1946 - 21 Mar 1947 |
| item | S/C7 | Messrs Allwright and Fraser | | | | | 05 Aug 1946 - 25 Feb 1947 |
| item | S/C8 | Quongs Bakery [Henry Quong] | | | | | 26 Aug 1946 - 29 Aug 1946 |
| item | S/C9 | Lim, Lorna | | | | | 14 Aug 1946 - 05 Feb 1947 |
| item | S/C10 | Elcock, Eileen; trading as Kay Garland | | | | | 03 Aug 1946 - 12 Sep 1958 |
| item | S/C11 | Litchfield, JS (Mrs) | | | | | 10 Jul 1946 - 07 Aug 1951 |
| item | S/C12 | Osborne, AW | | | | | 16 Jul 1946 - 10 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C13 | Edwards, W | | | | | 29 Aug 1946 - 29 Aug 1946 |
| item | S/C14 | Conanan, M | | | | | 29 Aug 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C15 | Meaney, JH | | | | | 29 Aug 1946 - 29 Aug 1946 |
| item | S/C16 | AE Jolly and Company | | | | | 28 Aug 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C17 | Royal Antedeluvian Order of Buffaloes | | | | | 03 Sep 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C18 | Fong, Albert; Chan, Harry | | | | | 03 Sep 1946 - 14 Nov 1946 |
| item | S/C19 | Callil, M | | | | | 28 Aug 1946 - 22 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C20 | Manning, SW | | | | | 29 Aug 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C21 | Graetz, ME | | | | | 03 Sep 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C23 | Proceedings; Subcommittee on building and temporary lease applications | | | | | 18 Jul 1946 - 15 Apr 1947 |
| item | S/C24 | Applications, general; for temporary premises | | | | | 28 Aug 1946 - 12 Mar 1947 |
| item | S/C25 | Shaw, R | | | | | 03 Sep 1946 - 03 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C27 | McGuffin, WJ | | | | | 30 Aug 1946 - 25 Feb 1947 |
| item | S/C30 | Methodist Overseas Missions | | | | | 05 Sep 1946 - 12 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C31 | Howarth, JS | | | | | 18 Sep 1946 - 18 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C32 | Agenda; Subcommittee on building and temporary lease applications | | | | | 18 Feb 1947 - 29 Apr 1947 |
| item | S/C33 | Day nursery and kindergarten (Sister Harris) | | | | | 19 Sep 1946 - 27 May 1947 |
| item | S/C34 | Payne, C | | | | | 19 Sep 1946 - 26 Sep 1946 |
| item | S/C35 | [General applications] | | | | | 05 Mar 1947 - 02 Jul 1947 |
| item | S/C36 | Kennon, SG | | | | | 16 Sep 1946 - 18 Apr 1947 |
| item | S/C38 | Messrs Gunellas and Hagan | | | | | 23 Sep 1946 - 07 Mar 1952 |
| item | S/C39 | Arnold, Alexander Duncan | | | | | 21 Sep 1946 - 01 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C40 | White, H; taxi proprietor | | | | | 01 Oct 1946 - 01 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C41 | Messrs Chin Gong and CA Ming | | | | | 03 Oct 1946 - 14 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C42 | Stanton, James | | | | | 01 Oct 1946 - 14 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C43 | Carolin, HM | | | | | 01 Oct 1946 - 14 Nov 1946 |
| item | S/C44 | Messrs Ferguson and McManus; Baxter, S | | | | | 08 Oct 1946 - 16 Apr 1947 |
| item | S/C45 | Tranter, N | | | | | 25 Oct 1946 - 25 Oct 1946 |
| item | S/C46 | Tokmakoff, L | | | | | 02 Nov 1946 - 04 Mar 1948 |
| item | S/C47 | Harris, TD | | | | | 11 Nov 1946 - 25 Feb 1947 |
| item | S/C48 | Hannon, MJ | | | | | 12 Sep 1946 - 25 Nov 1946 |
| item | S/C49 | Martin Brothers; Messrs Savieri and Edwards | | | | | 12 Oct 1946 - 07 Mar 1947 |
| item | S/C50 | Makagon, J | | | | | 21 Nov 1946 - 24 Jan 1947 |
| item | S/C51 | Muir, WJ | | | | | 14 Dec 1946 - 15 Apr 1948 |
| item | S/C52 | Que Noy, Albert | | | | | 07 Oct 1946 - 23 Jan 1947 |
| item | S/C53 | [Applications for land] | | | | | 20 Dec 1946 - 12 Feb 1947 |
| item | S/C54 | Litchfield, KC | | | | | 20 Dec 1946 - 21 Apr 1947 |
| item | S/C55 | [Applications to build temporary shelters] | | | | | 11 Dec 1946 - 06 May 1947 |