163 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | OL 255 | [Gordon, Raymond George] | [stabling purposes] | | | | 26 Jul 1948 - 26 Jul 1948 |
| item | OL 257 | [Bloomfield, HJL] | [stabling purposes] | | | | 09 Jul 1948 - 02 Sep 1948 |
| item | OL 261 | [Graham, Ashley] | [miscellaneous] | | | | 10 Nov 1948 - 10 May 1950 |
| item | OL 281 | [Bloomfield, Baden] | [horse training stable] | | | | 12 Sep 1950 - 27 Feb 1951 |
| item | OL 282 | [Swain, Verdun Mex] | [recreation, trial boring for water supply for a swimming pool] | | | | 05 Dec 1950 - 22 Jun 1951 |
| item | OL 288 | Hauth, W [William] A [Arnold] | [recreation, camping purposes] | | | | 16 Oct 1951 - 07 Feb 1952 |
| item | OL 291 | [Marshall, Charles] | [Alice Springs camping reserve] | | | | 25 Feb 1952 - 08 Apr 1952 |
| item | OL 293 | [Darken, RC] | [stabling purposes] | | | | 28 Mar 1952 - 28 Nov 1955 |
| item | OL 294 | [Palmer, Dick] | [droving camp and storage] | | | | 24 Oct 1950 - 10 Sep 1957 |
| item | OL 298 | [Nicolaci, Pasquale] | [occupy old army blockhouse] | | | | 16 Apr 1952 - 25 Jul 1952 |
| item | OL 305 | [Miller, Ronald Nevill Damian] | [residential area] | | | | 02 Apr 1953 - 22 Apr 1953 |
| item | OL 311 | [Gagliardi, Antonio] | [renewal] | | | | 28 Jul 1953 - 30 Jun 1959 |
| item | OL 319 | [Pick, Richard Henry] | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 18 Dec 1953 - 29 Apr 1954 |
| item | OL 323 | [Hanrahan, Alan John] | [obtaining a water supply] | | | | 29 Jun 1953 - 28 Apr 1954 |
| item | OL 325 | [McRae, Ian Malcom] | [obtaining a water supply] | | | | 29 Apr 1954 - 20 Feb 1956 |
| item | OL 326 | [Summers, George Hourigan] | [obtaining a water supply] | | | | 18 May 1954 - 13 Jul 1954 |
| item | OL 327 | [Heenan, Francis Brendon Carl] | [obtaining a water supply] | | | | 29 Mar 1954 - 15 Jul 1955 |
| item | OL 328 | [Pope, Arthur Lawrence] | [racing stable purposes] | | | | 06 May 1954 - 19 Aug 1954 |
| item | OL 331 | [Wright, Noel] | [obtaining a water supply] | | | | 02 Jun 1954 - 23 Aug 1954 |
| item | OL 334 | [Muir, Ronald Sibbald] | [gardening purposes] | | | | 21 Jun 1954 - 10 Nov 1954 |
| item | OL 339 | [Byrnes, Desmond Howard] | [recreation purposes] | | | | 07 Oct 1954 - 19 Jan 1955 |
| item | OL 340 | [Heenan, Francis Brendon Carl] | [gardening purposes] | | | | 09 Nov 1954 - 15 Apr 1955 |
| item | OL 343 | Oldfield, V [Vivian] F [Francis] | [conducting a racing stable] | | | | 15 Nov 1954 - 01 Feb 1955 |
| item | OL 348 | [Corbet, Leo James] | [gardening purposes] | | | | 21 Jan 1955 - 25 Feb 1955 |
| item | OL 350 | [Tilmouth, Wauchope] | [racing stable purposes] | | | | 07 Feb 1955 - 04 Mar 1955 |
| item | OL 352 | JW Fowles, Barrow Creek, recreation and camping | [recreation purposes] | | | | 13 Feb 1957 - 13 Feb 1957 |
| item | OL 353 | [Smith, Willie] | [racing stable purposes] | | | | 25 Feb 1955 - 21 Mar 1955 |
| item | OL 357 | [De Fontenay, Victor John and De Fontenay, Ursula] | [gardening purposes] | | | | 24 May 1955 - 23 Sep 1957 |
| item | OL 369 | [Pick, Richard Henry] | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 29 Sep 1955 - 23 Sep 1959 |
| item | OL 376 | L [Leo James] Corbet | [gardening purposes] | | | | 16 Mar 1956 - 05 Jun 1957 |
| item | OL 379 | BF [Bernard Francis] and AC [Aileen Carmel] Kilgariff | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 01 Aug 1956 - 31 Jul 1957 |
| item | OL 381 | WR [Walter Riley] Curtis | [searching for water for gardening purposes] | | | | 06 Sep 1955 - 17 Nov 1960 |
| item | OL 389 | [Drilling Services Proprietary Limited] | [improvements] | | | | 16 Sep 1958 - 07 Oct 1958 |
| item | OL 394 | W [William] Bohning | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 10 Jan 1957 - 27 Mar 1957 |
| item | OL 395 | ID [Ian Donovan] Michael | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 24 Jan 1957 - 26 Apr 1957 |
| item | OL 396 | JW [John Wesley] Fowles | [Barrow Creek, recreation, camping purposes] | | | | 11 Mar 1957 - 12 Apr 1957 |
| item | OL 399 | Alice Springs Tours Company Ltd [Limited] | [recreation, camping purposes] | | | | 11 Mar 1957 - 13 Jun 1957 |
| item | OL 402 | Leo James Corbet | [gardening purposes] | | | | 19 Jun 1957 - 13 Aug 1957 |
| item | OL 405 | Frederick John Vandenburg | [industrial, pump house to accommodate pumping plant] | | | | 01 Sep 1957 - 05 Jan 1960 |
| item | OL 407 | EJ [Edward John] Connellan | [industrial, gardening purposes] | | | | 09 Apr 1957 - 30 Oct 1959 |
| item | OL 408 | Leo James Corbet | [gardening purposes] | | | | 30 Jul 1957 - 01 Oct 1957 |
| item | OL 409 | Gordon Ridge | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 01 Aug 1957 - 27 Mar 1961 |
| item | OL 411 | C [Colin] and KL [Kathleen Louisa] Johns | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 30 Jul 1957 - 03 Nov 1959 |
| item | OL 414 | Edward Charles Milgate | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 15 Aug 1957 - 29 Nov 1957 |
| item | OL 416 | Knud Ronberg | [industrial, caravan park purposes] | | | | 12 Sep 1957 - 31 Mar 1959 |
| item | OL 431 | KM [Kenneth Malcom] McIntyre | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 20 May 1958 - 13 Jul 1960 |
| item | OL 432 | AS [Alice Springs] Gliding Club [Arthur Ronald Haines and Albert Ernest McTavish] | [recreation, gliding club hangar purposes] | | | | 11 Nov 1957 - 02 Jun 1958 |
| item | OL 436 | RE [Ralph Edward] Smith | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 01 Aug 1958 - 27 Aug 1958 |
| item | OL 437 | [Jocelyn Melanie] Cutlack | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 11 Aug 1958 - 27 Aug 1958 |
| item | OL 438 | RA [Richard Albert] Drogemuller | [industrial, site for stone and saw storage] | | | | 30 Jul 1958 - 11 Aug 1958 |
| item | OL 451 | Herbert Thomas Cole | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 26 Mar 1959 - 06 Jul 1961 |
| item | OL 453 | Rosewall [Earthmovers Limited] | [industrial, storage and maintenance of equipment and messing purposes] | | | | 17 Apr 1959 - 15 Mar 1961 |
| item | OL 455 | EM [Edward Maxwell] Smith | [industrial, erecting machinery for screening sand] | | | | 07 Mar 1959 - 18 Jun 1959 |
| item | OL 459 | Keith John Arthur | [industrial, development and storage of water] | | | | 11 Jun 1959 - 22 Jul 1959 |
| item | OL 464 | Werner Grave | [industrial, office accommodation and concrete mixing depot] | | | | 28 Jul 1959 - 03 May 1961 |
| item | OL 480 | Werner Greve | [industrial, erection of machinery for supplying ready mixed concrete] | | | | 01 Dec 1959 - 22 Jan 1960 |
| item | OL 481 | AE [Alfred Edward] Chittock | [industrial, slaughtering yard] | | | | 11 Aug 1959 - 20 Jan 1960 |
| item | OL 486 | FJ [Frederick John] Vandenberg | [industrial, pump house to accommodate pumping plant] | | | | 11 Feb 1960 - 18 Apr 1962 |
| item | OL 488 | [John Linde] Swanon, expired | [industrial, turkey grazing] | | | | 24 Feb 1960 - 21 Mar 1960 |
| item | OL 493 | Scorer, R E [Robert Everett] | [industrial, floatplane hangarage non-commercial, Fannie Bay] | | | | 07 Jul 1960 - 21 Sep 1962 |
| item | OL 501 | N [Noel] Wright | [industrial, water supply] | | | | 24 Jun 1960 - 04 Nov 1960 |
| item | OL 522 | Turner, Alfred [Albert] William, expired | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 11 Aug 1958 - 14 Dec 1964 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | OL 550 | Summer, GCH [George Carey Hourigan] | [industrial, obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 10 Jan 1956 - 01 Jul 1965 |
| item | OL 551 | Butler, [James Henry], expired | [industrial, sanitary contracting] | | | | 22 Jun 1960 - 18 May 1962 |
| item | OL 557 | AS [Alice Springs] Polo Club, expired | [recreation, polo club playing field) | | | | 15 May 1961 - 01 Oct 1962 |
| item | OL 559 | Pioneer Tuit, cancelled, auctioned 26/08/1967, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2482, lot 1764 | [industrial, drainage system] | | | | 06 Oct 1959 - 24 Oct 1966 |
| item | OL 560 | Cramer, G R [Gilbert Rowland], lot 1333 | [industrial, obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 08 Jul 1957 - 05 May 1965 |
| item | OL 562 | Swanson, [John Lindle], expired, superseded by OL 829 | | | | | 09 Jul 1970 - 09 Jul 1970 |
| item | OL 570 | Kittle Bros [Brothers] (T/C) [Tennant Creek] Ltd [Limited] | [industrial, storage of wrecked vehicles] | | | | 01 Jul 1963 - 09 Jul 1963 |
| item | OL 580 | M [Milton] Liddle, expired | [industrial, firewood depot] | | | | 09 Aug 1963 - 29 Sep 1965 |
| item | OL 595 | Whitlock, [Wilfred Hercy], superseded by [Occupational Lease] 645, 08/07/1965, expired | [industrial, storage] | | | | 20 Nov 1963 - 19 May 1965 |
| item | OL 606 | Alice Springs Gliding Club, expired | [recreation, glider club hangar] | | | | 30 Sep 1959 - 18 Aug 1965 |
| item | OL 625 | [Fleet Owners Proprietary Limited], expired, now lot 2582, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2494, auctioned 26/08/1967 | [industrial, heavy vehicle parking] | | | | 02 Feb 1965 - 11 Jul 1967 |
| item | OL 626 | [Cooper, William Reginald], expired 1597, TLL [Town Land Lease] 3196, auctioned 20/03/1971 | [industrial, firewood storage] | | | | 12 Mar 1965 - 07 Sep 1965 |
| item | OL 629 | [Wright, William Archibald and Wright, Ethel Joyce], expired, lot 2699, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2582, auctioned 20/04/1968 | [industrial, vehicle and general storage] | | | | 25 Mar 1965 - 15 May 1968 |
| item | OL 633 | Ramsay and Hodgman [Proprietary Limited], expired, lot 2704, TLL [Town Land Lease], auctioned 20/04/1968 | [industrial, bitumen depot] | | | | 08 Sep 1964 - 19 Apr 1968 |
| item | OL 636 | EM and EJ Smith Ltd [Limited], expired | [industrial, access road] | | | | 25 Jun 1962 - 04 May 1966 |
| item | OL 639 | FBC [Francis Brendan Carl] Heenan, expired | [industrial, obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 05 Apr 1965 - 25 Jun 1965 |
| item | OL 641 | Alice Springs Fibrous Plaster Works [Proprietary Limited] | [industrial, storage] | | | | 18 Feb 1964 - 19 Oct 1972 |
| item | OL 642 | JL [John Linde] Swanson, expired | [recreation, riding school] | | | | 31 Aug 1965 - 28 Jan 1970 |
| item | OL 645 | WH [Wilfred Hercy] Whitlock, expired, now TLL [Town Land Lease] 2555 (lot 2399) | industrial (storage) | | | | 31 Aug 1965 - 01 Aug 1966 |
| item | OL 647 | Mr. WR [William Reginald] Cooper, area allotted to Magellan Petroleum, OL [Occupational lease] 731, 12/12/1967 | [industrial, firewood depot] | | | | 01 Jun 1965 - 01 Jul 1966 |
| item | OL 650 | Baddock, lot 2420 AS [Alice Springs], adjunct to TLL [Town Land Lease] 1824, expired, now TLL 2399, lots 1499/2420, 24/11/1966 | [garden purposes] | | | | 28 Jul 1965 - 10 Aug 1965 |
| item | OL 654 | Gilbert, [Graham Brooks], lot 2419 AS [Alice Springs], expired, lot 2419 added to 1498, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2398 (originally TLL 1813) | [garden development] | | | | 03 Aug 1965 - 15 Nov 1965 |
| item | OL 655 | [Warner, Ernest George], adjunct to TLL [Town Land Lease] 1641, no longer applicable | [industrial, drainage] | | | | 06 Aug 1965 - 20 Oct 1965 |
| item | OL 656 | LF [Lavinia Florence] Jackson, adjunct to TLL [Town Land Lease] 1824, lot 2418 AS [Alice Springs], expired 1966, now TLL 2400, transferred to Herbert de Brenni, 18/05/1971 | [garden development] | | | | 03 Aug 1965 - 30 Sep 1966 |
| item | OL 665 | Expired, 1967, [Gilbert Roland] Cramer | [water conservation and plant trial] | | | | 27 Apr 1966 - 09 Sep 1966 |
| item | OL 669 | [Shell Company of Australia], cancelled, superseded by OL [occupational Lease] 718 on lot 556 | [industrial, bitumen storage kettles] | | | | 27 Jul 1966 - 13 Sep 1966 |
| item | OL 673 | DW [Donald William] Girlie, expired 31/08/1967 | [vehicle parking area] | | | | 14 Jul 1966 - 13 Sep 1967 |
| item | OL 674 | Magellan [Petroleum Corporation of Alice Springs], cancelled, replaced by alternative site under OL [Occupational Lease] 731 | [bore casing and pipe storage] | | | | 05 Aug 1966 - 27 Jun 1967 |
| item | OL 676 | West Construction Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited], cancelled, auctioned 26/08/1967, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2497 | [industrial, bulk concrete mixing] | | | | 18 Aug 1966 - 22 Mar 1967 |
| item | OL 682 | RH [Richard Henry] Pick, expired | Industrial (Obtaining and conserving water) | | | | 11 Sep 1959 - 10 Apr 1967 |
| item | OL 697 | [Wallace, Claude William and Wallace, Maisie Gladys], expired | [industrial, water conservation] | | | | 18 Jun 1965 - 20 Jul 1967 |
| item | OL 698 | [De Luca, Antonio and De Luca, Bassilio], expired | [industrial, market gardening] | | | | 15 Mar 1967 - 16 May 1972 |
| item | OL 700 | J [James] Berry, 3-ways [Threeways] | Three Ways [business, water supply and gardening] | | | | 20 Mar 1967 - 21 Mar 1967 |
| item | OL 701 | [Apex Club of Alice Springs], cancelled | [rodeo and ancillary] | | | | 28 Feb 1967 - 15 Jun 1967 |
| item | OL 710 | [McAskill, Malcom Stewart], expired | [industrial, radio aerial] | | | | 28 Mar 1967 - 03 Nov 1967 |
| item | OL 732 | Ramsay and Hodgeman, cancelled, now part of lot 1015 | [industrial, storage] | | | | 20 Nov 1967 - 15 Dec 1969 |
| item | OL 742 | RF [Robert Francis] Baldock, expired | [industrial, sawmilling] | | | | 31 Oct 1963 - 20 May 1971 |
| item | OL 744 | LG [Lenard Gordon] Hargrave, expired, alternative site lot 2703, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2584, auctioned 20/04/1968 | [industrial, water pipeline] | | | | 08 Feb 1966 - 07 Mar 1969 |
3 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | OL 745 | Expired, Cramer, [Gilbert Roland and Mona Elizabeth] | [industrial, obtaining water] | | | | 20 Nov 1967 - 01 Jun 1970 |
| item | OL 748 | MJ [Maxwell John] Hargrave, expired | [industrial, firewood depot] | | | | 28 Feb 1968 - 15 May 1968 |
| item | OL 760 | Alice Springs Motor Cycle Club, expired | [recreation, go-cart and motor cycle track] | | | | 09 Jul 1968 - 28 Sep 1971 |
| item | OL 762 | [Watson, Neil], cancelled, now lot 2439, TLL [Town Land Lease] 2843, auctioned 11/10/1969 | [vehicle parking] | | | | 09 Jun 1966 - 01 Oct 1969 |
| item | OL 773 | [Connellan, Edward John], cancelled | [industrial, water pipeline] | | | | 23 Oct 1968 - 04 Feb 1969 |
| item | OL 776 | [Buntine Freightways of Australia Proprietary Limited], expired | [industrial, vehicle parking] | | | | 13 Feb 1969 - 29 Oct 1973 |
| item | OL 778 | [Universal Constructions Proprietary Limited], expired | [industrial, storage and staff accommodation] | | | | 11 Feb 1969 - 05 Mar 1969 |
| item | OL 779 | [McKerlie, Mary Winifred], cancel, see OL [Occupational Lease] 871 | [industrial, firewood storage] | | | | 16 Nov 1966 - 07 Mar 1969 |
| item | OL 792 | [Central Australian Stock Car Club, Arunga Park Speedway Association] | [stock car racing] | | | | 29 Mar 1967 - 11 Sep 1972 |
| item | OL 794 | Antonio Gagliardi, cancelled | [industrial, water conservation] | | | | 16 Sep 1958 - 02 Jul 1973 |
| item | OL 795 | Lot 73 Tennant Creek [Tennant Creek Plumbing and Building Contractors Proprietary Limited] | [industrial storage] | | | | 01 Jul 1969 - 11 Dec 1969 |
| item | OL 805 | Russell Thomas Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited], cancelled, lots 1537 and 1538 TLLs [Town Land Leases] 3172 and 3173, auctioned 20/03/1971 | [industrial, storage] | | | | 13 Oct 1967 - 20 Oct 1970 |
| item | OL 808 | Ramsay and Hodgman Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | [industrial, storage] | | | | 20 Jan 1970 - 01 Apr 1976 |
| item | OL 815 | [Burrows, Alan Bryce], expired | [recreation and garden] | | | | 02 Jan 1969 - 31 Mar 1973 |
| item | OL 816 | [Johannsen, Kurt Gerhardt], expired | [crushing metal and lime kiln] | | | | 01 Dec 1969 - 20 Sep 1976 |
| item | OL 819 | [Anderson, Stanley], expired | [industrial, storage] | | | | 12 Mar 1970 - 13 Aug 1975 |
| item | OL 824 | [RPM Transport Proprietary Limited], adjunct to TLL [Town Land Lease] 1000 | [industrial, transport vehicle) | | | | 14 May 1965 - 01 Sep 1973 |
| item | OL 829 | JL [John Linde] Swanson | [industrial, turkey raising] | | | | 07 Jul 1960 - 17 Oct 1972 |
| item | OL 830 | [Lockyer, Denton Pinkstone Albert], not renewed | [industrial motor vehicle repairs] | | | | 10 Mar 1967 - 11 Oct 1974 |
| item | OL 836 | Tennant Creek Tyre Service [Garage Proprietors and Wreckers] | [scrap metal and wrecking yard] | | | | 17 Nov 1970 - 11 Jul 1973 |
| item | OL 837 | Ford Bros [Brothers] Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | [car wrecking] | | | | 01 Dec 1970 - 21 Jan 1971 |
| item | OL 838 | Bromage Earthmovers | [vehicle wrecking and general purposes | | | | 17 Nov 1970 - 24 Nov 1970 |
| item | OL 839 | R and R Stain | | | | | 24 Nov 1970 - 24 Nov 1970 |
| item | OL 868 | Arhery Club [Alice Springs Archery Club], expired | [archery] | | | | 26 May 1971 - 30 Mar 1973 |
| item | OL 869 | Miss Pink [Pink, Olive Muriel] | [industrial, gardening] | | | | 04 Jan 1967 - 29 Jul 1975 |
| item | OL 871 | Maxwell John Hargrave, rear lot 579 Mt [Mount] Nancy | [industrial, firewood storage and truck depot] | | | | 21 Mar 1972 - 29 May 1974 |
| item | OL 876 | Tea Tree [Ti Tree] [Walker, William Duncan Gray] | [workshop and storage] | | | | 09 Jun 1972 - 26 Jul 1974 |
| item | OL 878 | G and J Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] (Aerial) | [erection of radio aerial] | | | | 18 Oct 1971 - 20 Mar 1979 |
| item | OL 886 | Dussin Site Office [Dussin Construction Proprietary Limited], lot 3500, surrendered 14/03/1973 | [site office] | | | | 25 May 1972 - 10 May 1973 |
| item | OL 892 | MacMahon Construction, expired | [storage] | | | | 09 Dec 1971 - 23 Nov 1973 |
| item | OL 898 | Girl Guides Association, expired | | | | | 12 Apr 1972 - 03 Jan 1978 |
| item | OL 906 | Rabbit Flat, F [Ferdinand] Bergmann | [industrial, storage] | | | | 29 May 1972 - 28 Feb 1974 |
4 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | OL 915 | A/S [Alice Springs] Golf Club (dam site), expired | [industrial, conservation and storage of water] | | | | 25 Jul 1972 - 23 Oct 1973 |
| item | OL 924 | [Tuzewski, David and Tuzewski June], pipeline easement | [industrial water pipeline] | | | | 26 Apr 1968 - 05 Dec 1973 |
| item | OL 925 | Baldocks Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | | | | | 13 Dec 1973 - 26 Nov 1975 |
| item | OL 928 | MacMahon [Constructions Proprietary Limited], not renewed | [storage area for heavy earth moving equipment and mobile camp units] | | | | 14 Jan 1974 - 28 Oct 1974 |
| item | OL 929 | [Catelli, Salvo and Catelli, Letizia], adjunct to AL [Agricultural Lease] 556, expired 31/08/1972 | [gardening] | | | | 31 Jul 1970 - 20 May 1974 |
| item | OL 940 | HR [Henry Robert] Dowler, expired | [industrial, storage] | | | | 15 Jan 1974 - 12 Oct 1977 |
| item | OL 941 | Underdown, [Lycurgus John Rickard], farm area north of range | [industrial, water conservation] | | | | 27 Feb 1968 - 15 Aug 1974 |
| item | OL 946 | [Cramer, Gilbert Roland and Cramer, Mona Elizabeth], withdrawn | [garden and water conservation] | | | | 09 Aug 1965 - 17 Feb 1981 |
| item | OL 953 | [Oil Drilling and Exploration Proprietary Limited], expired | [industrial storage of drill pipe and general heavy drilling equipment] | | | | 07 Nov 1968 - 28 Jun 1976 |
| item | OL 962 | McMahon Constructions, expired | [industrial storage of sand] | | | | 25 Sep 1975 - 02 Feb 1976 |
| item | OL 965 | Jean Moss Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited], expired | [industrial, manoeuvring heavy vehicles and storage of fuel and oil products] | | | | 20 Oct 1975 - 26 Jan 1977 |
| item | OL 969 | [Doug Park Truck and Tractor Proprietary Limited], expired, area vacated | [industrial, storage] | | | | 09 Jul 1975 - 24 Jan 1977 |
| item | OL 970 | Dussin Bitumen, Mt [Mount] Nancy, expired, area vacated | [industrial, storage] | | | | 05 Apr 1973 - 24 Jan 1977 |
| item | OL 971 | [Central Australian Aborigines Congress Incorporated], expired | [obtaining and conserving water] | | | | 16 Sep 1970 - 16 Jul 1976 |
| item | OL 975 | [Smith, Thomas Edward and Smith, Alice], cancelled, see OL [Occupational Lease] 2002 | [gardening purposes] | | | | 25 Jan 1977 - 06 Jan 1981 |
| item | OL 981 | [Dory Constructions Proprietary Limited], expired, area vacated | [contractor's temporary accommodation] | | | | 06 May 1975 - 05 Apr 1977 |
| item | OL 985 | [Klein, Heinz Emil Otto], expired, see OL [Occupational Lease] 1066 | [commercial growing of mushrooms and horticulture] | | | | 25 Jul 1966 - 29 May 1979 |
| item | OL 986 | CAAC Inc [Central Australian Aborigines Congress Incorporated] | [agricultural and ancillary purposes] | | | | 30 Aug 1976 - 20 Feb 1979 |
| item | OL 1006 | [Tennant Creek Concrete Supplies Proprietary Limited], expired | [industrial, storage] | | | | 20 Apr 1977 - 04 Dec 1979 |
| item | OL 1006 [2] | Tennant Creek Concrete Supplies, expired | | | | | 13 Sep 1976 - 06 Apr 1977 |
| item | OL 1009 | Elsa Corbet (Mrs.), expired | [bore to supplement water supply] | | | | 10 Mar 1965 - 01 Jun 1977 |
| item | OL 1030 | [CRA Services] | | | | | 17 Dec 1979 - 17 Dec 1979 |
| item | OL 1044 | Central Aust [Australian] Aviation Museum Inc [Incorporated], surrendered 10/06/1981 | [restoration and storage of historical aircraft] | | | | 18 Oct 1978 - 10 Nov 1980 |
| item | OL 1061 | [Australian Development Limited], stand pipe area, expired 31/07/1980, not renewed | [stand pipe area] | | | | 02 Aug 1979 - 25 Sep 1980 |
| item | OL 1063 | [Cramer, Gilbert Roland and Cramer, Mona Elizabeth], expired, now OL [Occupational Lease] 2053 | [bore and pipeline] | | | | 31 Mar 1965 - 21 Aug 1980 |
| item | OL 1066 | [Klein, Heinz Emil Otto], formerly OL [Occupational Lease] 985, expired | [commercial growing of mushrooms and horticulture] | | | | 14 Sep 1979 - 31 Oct 1980 |
| item | OL 1090 | Anderson, Andrew], terminated 30/04/1981 | [industrial storage] | | | | 14 Feb 1978 - 23 Feb 1981 |