96 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | No 50 | Mineral lease, Alfred Bonnin and Arthur Harvey, office copy | | | | | 01 Jun 1888 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 154 | Mineral lease, Lionel Beville Treherne, office copy | | | | | 08 Sep 1899 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 155 | Mineral lease, Hildebrand Hilliam Havelock Stevens, office copy | | | | | 26 Dec 1899 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 158 | Mineral lease, Hildebrand Hilliam Havelock Stevens, office copy | | | | | 16 Nov 1900 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 159 | Mineral lease, Hildebrand Hilliam Havelock Stevens, office copy | | | | | 16 Nov 1900 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 166 | Mineral lease, Philip Greet, office copy | | | | | 10 Oct 1901 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 167 | Mineral lease, Isaac Daniels, office copy | | | | | 10 Oct 1901 - 17 Feb 1928 |
| item | No 168 | Mineral lease, Isaac Daniels, office copy | | | | | 10 Oct 1901 - 17 Feb 1928 |
| item | No 173 | Mineral lease, Edwin Tonkin Tamblyn, office copy | | | | | 20 Feb 1902 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 176 | Mineral lease, Thomas James White and James Seymour, office copy | | | | | 02 Nov 1903 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 182 | Mineral lease, Isaac Daniels, office copy | | | | | 19 Mar 1907 - 17 Feb 1928 |
| item | No 183 | Mineral lease, John Grant, office copy | | | | | 07 Jan 1908 - 02 Nov 1912 |
| item | No 184 | Mineral lease, Emerson Balston Cater, office copy | | | | | 02 Dec 1910 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 187 | Mineral lease, Cornet Hill Development Company, office copy | | | | | 12 Sep 1918 - 28 Jul 1927 |
| item | No 188 | Mineral lease, Cornet Hill Development Company, office copy | | | | | 12 Sep 1918 - 28 Jul 1927 |
| item | No 189 | Mineral lease, May Brown, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 04 Jan 1934 |
| item | No 190 | Mineral lease, May Brown, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 04 Jan 1934 |
| item | No 191 | Mineral lease, William Cater, office copy | | | | | 09 Dec 1915 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 192 | Mineral lease, William Cater, office copy | | | | | 09 Dec 1915 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 193 | Mineral lease, Ernest Edward Castle, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 02 Jul 1919 |
| item | No 194 | Mineral lease, Ernest Edward Castle, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 02 Jul 1919 |
| item | No 195 | Mineral lease, Henry Lee, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 03 Oct 1917 |
| item | No 196 | Mineral lease, Henry Lee, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 03 Oct 1917 |
| item | No 197 | Mineral lease, Alfred Pain, office copy | | | | | 08 Feb 1916 - 02 Jul 1919 |
| item | No 198 | Mineral lease, Peter Bell, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 28 Oct 1937 |
| item | No 199 | Mineral lease, Peter Bell, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 28 Oct 1937 |
| item | No 200 | Mineral lease, Frances Crush, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 01 Mar 1930 |
| item | No 201 | Mineral lease, Walter Charles Puxton Bell and John McCarthy, office copy | | | | | 29 Jan 1916 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 202 | Mineral lease, John Mccarthy, Daniel Dillon, John Hore and Frank Jones, office copy | | | | | 13 Feb 1917 - 25 Jun 1925 |
| item | No 203 | Mineral lease, Edwin Tonkin Tamblyn and Harry Morris, office copy | | | | | 21 Nov 1916 - 07 Apr 1921 |
| item | No 204 | Mineral lease, Edwin Tonkin Tamblyn and Harry Morris, office copy | | | | | 21 Nov 1916 - 07 Apr 1921 |
| item | No 205 | Mineral lease, John McCarthy and John Hore, office copy | | | | | 21 Nov 1916 - 25 Jun 1925 |
| item | No 206 | Mineral lease, George Buttle, office copy | | | | | 21 Nov 1916 - 07 Apr 1921 |
| item | No 207 | Mineral lease, Thomas James White and Michael Condon, office copy | | | | | 15 Sep 1917 - 03 May 1921 |
| item | No 208 | Mineral lease, Timothy O'Shea, office copy | | | | | 15 Sep 1917 - 02 Jul 1919 |
| item | No 209 | Mineral lease, Daid John Davies Bevan and Phillip Hilton Hope, office copy | | | | | 04 Sep 1917 - 03 May 1921 |
| item | No 210 | Mineral lease, Daid John Davies Bevan and Phillip Hilton Hope, office copy | | | | | 04 Sep 1917 - 03 May 1921 |
| item | No 211 | Mineral lease, William Curtis, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 16 Aug 1918 - 16 May 1938 |
| item | | Letter of transfer of mineral leases 211, 212, 213, 214 and 242 | | | | | 05 Aug 1938 - 13 Aug 1938 |
| item | No 212 | Mineral lease, Frances Robert William Scott, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 22 Aug 1918 - 16 May 1938 |
| item | No 213 | Mineral lease, William George Weldon, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 22 Aug 1918 - 16 May 1938 |
| item | No 214 | Mineral lease, Thomas Moar, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 16 Aug 1918 - 16 May 1938 |
| item | No 215 | Mineral lease, Bell's Tin Mines, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 03 Dec 1917 - 28 Oct 1937 |
| item | No 216 | Mineral lease, Bell's Tin Mines, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 03 Dec 1917 - 28 Oct 1937 |
| item | No 217 | Mineral lease, William Thomas Pearce, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 15 Sep 1917 - 27 Jul 1929 |
| item | No 218 | Mineral lease, Thomas White, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 15 Sep 1917 - 18 Jun 1941 |
| item | No 220 | Mineral lease, Peter Joel Cooper and Gilbert Henry Langdon Edwards, office copy | | | | | 12 Mar 1918 - 07 Apr 1921 |
| item | No 221 | Mineral lease, George Stevens, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Jan 1918 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 222 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 223 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 224 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 225 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 226 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 227 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | No 228 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 229 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 230 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon and Richard Edward Warne, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Aug 1918 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 231 | Mineral lease, Henry Herbert Dixon and George Masters, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 16 Aug 1918 - 08 Jan 1931 |
| item | No 232 | Mineral lease, Sydney Yelkie Churchill Smith, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 16 Aug 1918 - 18 Aug 1918 |
| item | No 233 | Mineral lease, Amy Muir, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 21 Nov 1917 - 28 Oct 1937 |
| item | No 234 | Mineral lease, Amy Muir, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 21 Nov 1917 - 28 Oct 1937 |
| item | No 235 | Mineral lease, Frank Frith and William Mathew Jones, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Jan 1918 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 236 | Mineral lease, Laurence Donnison, Frank Frith and Adam Broomfield, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Jan 1918 - 26 Apr 1923 |
| item | No 237 | Mineral lease, Coronet Hill Development Company, office copy | | | | | 12 Sep 1918 - 28 Jul 1927 |
| item | No 238 | Mineral lease, Thomas Kewly and William Isaacson, office copy | | | | | 08 Jan 1918 - 02 Jul 1919 |
| item | No 239 | Mineral lease, William Henry Grant, office copy | | | | | 03 May 1918 - 07 Apr 1921 |
| item | No 240 | Mineral lease, Coronet Hill Development Company, office copy | | | | | 12 Sep 1918 - 28 Jul 1927 |
| item | No 241 | Mineral lease, Thiginio Spain, office copy | | | | | 01 Jul 1918 - 07 Apr 1921 |
| item | No 242 | Mineral lease, Henry Joseph Turner, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 16 Aug 1918 - 16 May 1938 |
| item | No 243 | Mineral lease, Hugh Alexander Gourley, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 04 Sep 1917 - 03 May 1921 |
| item | No 244 | Mineral lease, Frances Haynes, office copy | | | | | 22 Mar 1920 - 01 Mar 1930 |
| item | No 245 | Mineral lease, Wilfred James Hanlon, office copy (2 copies), Declared Void | | | | | 11 Sep 1923 - 11 Sep 1923 |
| item | No 246 | Mineral lease, Alan Herbert Stokes, office copy (2 copies), Declared Void | | | | | 01 Jul 1917 - 08 Jul 1921 |
| item | No 247 | Mineral lease, Claude William Hamilton, office copy (2 copies), Declared Void | | | | | 01 Jul 1917 - 09 Aug 1921 |
| item | No 248 | Mineral lease, Charles Christopher Heinrick, office copy (2 copies), Declared Void | | | | | 01 Jan 1918 - 11 Sep 1923 |
| item | No 249 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 17 Aug 1921 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 250 | Mineral lease, George Masters, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 02 Apr 1921 - 08 Jan 1931 |
| item | No 251 | Mineral lease, George Masters, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 02 Apr 1921 - 08 Jan 1931 |
| item | No 252 | Mineral lease, Thomas Terence Hanlon, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 17 Aug 1921 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 253 | Mineral lease, Charles Opie Staite, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 19 Apr 1922 - 30 Apr 1925 |
| item | No 254 | Mineral lease, Charles Heinrick, George Masters, Fredrick Hamilton and Harry Dixon, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 01 Jul 1918 - 11 Sep 1923 |
| item | No 255 | Mineral lease, Charles Heinrick, George Masters, Fredrick Hamilton and Harry Dixon, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 01 Jul 1918 - 11 Sep 1923 |
| item | No 256 | Mineral lease, Sydney Yelkie Churchill Smith, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 17 Aug 1921 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 257 | Mineral lease, James Shannon, office copy (2 copies), declared void | | | | | 01 Jul 1917 - 08 Jul 1921 |
| item | No 258 | Mineral lease, William Haddock, office copy (2 copies), declared void | | | | | 01 Jul 1918 - 28 Jun 1922 |
| item | No 259 | Mineral lease, Henry Joseph Turner, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 24 Mar 1924 - 16 Sep 1938 |
| item | No 260 | Mineral lease, Humphrey Hudson Pepperell, office copy | | | | | 22 Mar 1921 - 01 Nov 1922 |
| item | No 261 | Mineral lease, Charles James Burns, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 06 Sep 1921 - 25 Jun 1925 |
| item | No 262 | Mineral lease, Marranboy Mining Company, office copy (3 copies) | | | | | 18 Oct 1928 - 27 Jul 1929 |
| item | No 263 | Mineral lease, John Fotinos, office copy (2 copies) | | | | | 08 Sep 1928 - 02 Oct 1940 |
| item | No 264 | Mineral lease, Marranboy Mining Company, office copy (3 copies) | | | | | 18 Oct 1928 - 07 May 1937 |
| item | No 265 | Mineral lease, Marranboy Mining Company, office copy (3 copies) | | | | | 18 Oct 1928 - 27 Jul 1929 |
| item | No 266 | Mineral lease, Marranboy Mining Company, office copy (3 copies) | | | | | 18 Oct 1928 - 27 Jul 1929 |
| item | No 267 | Mineral lease, Marranboy Mining Company, office copy (3 copies) | | | | | 18 Oct 1928 - 27 Jul 1929 |