41 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | | East Point Road | | | | | 04 Sep 1933 - 15 Apr 1938 |
| item | | Export of live cattle to Fremantle Western Australia | | | | | 28 Oct 1936 - 25 Nov 1938 |
| item | | Queensland Country Women's Association, Northern Territory Branch; application for block of land | | | | | 26 Jun 1937 - 13 Jul 1938 |
| item | | Proposed new Aboriginal compound | | | | | 20 Nov 1936 - 25 May 1938 |
| item | | Bagot Road District Board | | | | | 05 Oct 1914 - 08 Oct 1937 |
| item | | Pine Creek (Playford Institute) | | | | | 08 Feb 1936 - 05 Oct 1937 |
| item | | Proposed swimming pool, Alice Springs | | | | | 15 Feb 1937 - 30 Sep 1937 |
| item | | Alice Springs Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 18 Nov 1932 - 05 Mar 1937 |
| item | | Request by Gregory and Company for purchase of lease of site on which "mud hut", Darwin, was erected and for a lease of the adjoining foreshore | | | | | 19 Apr 1934 - 07 Mar 1935 |
| item | | Pine Creek Recreation Reserve | | | | | 16 Apr 1934 - 17 Dec 1935 |
| item | | Refusal of application for a grazing licence by Arthur Edward Sargent, Valeska Marie Sargent and Mortimer O'Sullivan | | | | | 09 Nov 1933 - 04 Feb 1935 |
| item | | Golf Club course [use of landing ground, Darwin, as a golf course] | | | | | 07 May 1930 - 15 Feb 1935 |
| item | | Slaughtering Reserve, Alice Springs | | | | | 11 Nov 1932 - 26 Jun 1934 |
| item | | Land for Judge's residence | | | | | 01 Mar 1934 - 22 Mar 1934 |
| item | | Sanitary service, Stuart | | | | | 06 Mar 1933 - 09 Jan 1934 |
| item | | Slaughtering Reserve, Darwin | | | | | 29 Jun 1933 - 05 Nov 1934 |
| item | | Cutting of timber, Aboriginal Branch | | | | | 04 Feb 1933 - 05 Feb 1934 |
| item | | Destruction of trees at Stuart [Alice Springs] | | | | | 18 Sep 1930 - 12 May 1933 |
| item | | Bequests to Aboriginals | | | | | 01 Jun 1933 - 16 Aug 1933 |
| item | | Closing of part of main road north of Alice Springs Telegraph Reserve | | | | | 20 Feb 1932 - 21 Aug 1933 |
| item | | Allotment of No 522, town of Darwin [adjoining Victoria Hotel] | | | | | 11 May 1929 - 11 Oct 1933 |
| item | | Licences to obtain and remove sand | | | | | 17 Jul 1931 - 19 Sep 1933 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | | Illegal occupation of railway land at Birdum by Mrs ME Jacobsen; request for lease or licence to cover occupancy | | | | | 04 Feb 1932 - 05 Aug 1932 |
| item | | Stone; removal off pastoral leases | | | | | 19 Jul 1930 - 11 Jun 1931 |
| item | | Garden licences under Mining Act 1903; cooperation and coordination of Lands and Mines Branches business | | | | | 15 Nov 1929 - 12 Jun 1930 |
| item | | Advice regarding Northern Territory Mining Act 1903 and Regulations; application to garden licences | | | | | 31 Jan 1930 - 06 Mar 1930 |
| item | | Legal clarification of the appointment of Mr Driver as acting Surveyor-General | | | | | c 1944 - c 1944 |
| item | | Instruments of Crown leases, Alice Springs | | | | | 30 Oct 1942 - 17 Nov 1942 |
| item | | North Australian Pastoral Company Limited | | | | | 18 Oct 1923 - 25 Aug 1941 |
| item | | Removal of sand and stone from Darwin beaches | | | | | 17 Feb 1938 - 28 Apr 1941 |
| item | | Burnside and Marrakai; pastoral lands open for application | | | | | 12 Jul 1940 - 02 Aug 1940 |
| item | | Arnhem Land Aboriginal Reserve | | | | | 05 Feb 1931 - 18 Jan 1941 |
| item | | Civil aerodrome Darwin; resumption additional area | | | | | 09 Jul 1941 - 12 Jan 1942 |
| item | | Gravel licences, Tennant Creek | | | | | 22 Jun 1939 - 06 Nov 1940 |
| item | | Allotments 296, 297, 298 and 306; Town of Darwin [Terminus Hotel] | | | | | 27 Oct 1931 - 31 Aug 1939 |
| item | | RAN [Royal Australian Navy] resumption, town of Darwin; Cavenagh, Wood and Smith Streets | | | | | 22 Aug 1938 - 26 Sep 1939 |
| item | | Enquiries about land forwarded by Administration | | | | | 30 Jun 1939 - 02 Nov 1942 |
| item | | Correspondence relating to administration of lands registration | | | | | 03 Apr 1914 - 08 Feb 1939 |
| item | | Correspondence relating to lands staff | | | | | 21 Oct 1926 - 05 Nov 1942 |