61 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 17/C | Appointment papers of surveyor HM Chrisp and party, EF Aron and W Blunt | | | | | 23 Aug 1915 - 05 Apr 1916 |
| item | 80/C | Papers, surveyor Charles G Chapman and assistant PH Birt, cook W Laycock, field hand P Bryant, chainman B Pye, and chainman WR Mills | | | | | 31 May 1912 - 14 Jul 1916 |
| item | 101/S | Appointment of surveyor, AB Scandrett | | | | | 16 Jul 1912 - 25 Oct 1918 |
| item | 165B/137 | Surveyor Chapman's correspondence with surveys on Daly River | | | | | 07 Dec 1912 - 17 Jan 1915 |
| item | 165B/7 | Surveys in Daly River district by Mr Cummins | | | | | 07 Dec 1912 - 10 Jun 1913 |
| item | 170/7 | Surveys in Hd [Hundred of] Waterhouse | | | | | 21 Nov 1912 - 05 Mar 1914 |
| item | 174/B | Appointment, Stan W Brown, clerk | | | | | 31 Aug 1912 - 12 Apr 1917 |
| item | 182/C | Appointment of surveyor, JJ Cummins and party; resignation of Mr Cummins | | | | | 21 Mar 1912 - 04 Feb 1916 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 185/7 part 1 | Extension of surveys in the Northern Territory | | | | | 10 Dec 1912 - 27 Aug 1914 |
| item | 185/7 part 2 | Extension of surveys in the Northern Territory from 26/3/1914 | | | | | 01 Apr 1914 - 10 Feb 1915 |
| item | 186/M | Appointment of HC McPherson as draughtsman and computist | | | | | 15 Nov 1912 - 14 Dec 1914 |
| item | 226/7 | Surveys of Darwin allotments | | | | | 09 Oct 1914 - 15 Mar 1915 |
| item | 240/B | Papers, WE [William Ernest] Bliss, assistant surveyor | | | | | 22 Feb 1913 - 13 Dec 1918 |
| item | 301/M | Appointment of surveyor, JW [John Wesley] Mott | | | | | 22 Apr 1913 - 22 Feb 1917 |
| item | 304/1 | Appointment of surveyor, CC Boulter | | | | | 22 Apr 1913 - 03 Dec 1915 |
| item | 306/1 | Appointment of surveyor, Roderick Hayes | | | | | 25 Apr 1913 - 19 Jan 1914 |
| item | 330/46 | Survey of coastline in connection with defence | | | | | 12 May 1913 - 19 May 1916 |
| item | 332/37 | Surveys in Hundred Selwyn by Surveyor Hayes | | | | | 16 May 1913 - 30 Jun 1914 |
3 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 333/7 | Trigonometrical survey of New South Wales | | | | | 22 Jan 1913 - 10 May 1913 |
| item | 334/1 | Appointment of surveyor, John Power | | | | | 16 May 1913 - 01 Oct 1921 |
| item | 361/7 | Trigonometrical survey of the Roper River district by Surveyor Chrisp | | | | | 17 May 1913 - 14 Jan 1915 |
| item | 362/7 | Topographical survey at Bitter Springs of pastoral leases, nos. 1706, 1763, and 1784; also survey of Maranboy tinfield and Katherine and King rivers | | | | | 20 May 1913 - 11 Jan 1915 |
| item | 364/7 | Trig [trigonometrical] and topographical survey of the Victoria River District to Katherine River by Surveyor Scandrett | | | | | 16 May 1913 - 09 Sep 1914 |
| item | 455/7 | Hundred of Beaconsfield, surveys by Surveyor AJ Muntz | | | | | 18 Oct 1913 - 10 Jul 1914 |
| item | 466/6 | Employment of cadets in survey parties | | | | | 08 Jul 1913 - 04 Feb 1914 |
| item | 485/7 | Surveys in Hd [Hundred of] Howard by Surveyor Muntz | | | | | 17 Feb 1914 - 11 Jun 1914 |
| item | 481/7 | Surveys in Hundred of Howard by [surveyor] Briggs | | | | | 30 Oct 1913 - 22 Jun 1914 |
| item | 487/7 | Survey of block no.546, Darwin, RJD Mallam | | | | | 19 Nov 1913 - 30 Aug 1922 |
| item | 495/M | Papers, Surveyor Muntz | | | | | 02 Dec 1913 - 28 Jul 1916 |
| item | 528/1 | Surveyor AA Briggs | | | | | 21 Apr 1914 - 22 Sep 1915 |
| item | 538/7 | Surveys in Powell Creek district by Surveyor Muntz | | | | | 20 May 1914 - 20 Oct 1915 |
| item | 542/7 | Report and tracing of pastoral lease nos.2177, 2220 and 2176, Lake Nash | | | | | 20 Feb 1914 - 20 Feb 1914 |
| item | 547/7 | Report on land of eastern bank of Adelaide River in hundreds of Bundey and Beaconsfield | | | | | 28 Apr 1914 - 22 Dec 1914 |
4 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 561/7 | Surveys on Daly River by Surveyor AA Briggs | | | | | 08 Jul 1914 - 24 Oct 1914 |
| item | 567/7 | Topo [topographical] survey on Adelaide River by [surveyor] Mr Boulter | | | | | 19 Aug 1914 - 08 Sep 1914 |
| item | 575/C | Papers, appointment and resignation, draftsman W Conolly | | | | | 08 Jul 1914 - 25 Mar 1916 |
| item | 579/7 | Surveys on Douglas River by Surveyor AA Briggs | | | | | 05 Sep 1914 - 16 Jan 1915 |
| item | 580/7 | Minister's policy, report on feature surveys of various rivers in Territory | | | | | 22 Jul 1914 - 15 Sep 1914 |
| item | 590/7 | Surveyor HH Kirkpatrick | | | | | 20 Oct 1914 - 01 Nov 1915 |
| item | 606/948/31 | Report on the country between the Daly and Finniss Rivers, west of the Hayward Range, by Surveyor AJ Lane | | | | | 20 Feb 1917 - 08 Mar 1917 |
| item | 611/6 | Annual report year ending 1914 by Chief Surveyor | | | | | 30 Jan 1915 - 12 Oct 1915 |
| item | 633/5 | Richards, Charles Henry | | | | | 13 Apr 1915 - 10 Sep 1920 |
| item | 650/6 | Report by FT Hamilton from Queensland border to Arltunga | | | | | 05 May 1915 - 18 May 1916 |
| item | 797/7 | Survey of Pine Creek Police Reserve | | | | | 25 Jun 1915 - 28 Jun 1934 |
| item | 813/7 | Survey of boundaries of GL's [grazing leases] 8 and 53, near Marrakai | | | | | 19 Jun 1915 - 01 Jun 1917 |
| item | 878/37 | Floods, Roper River, 1915 (surveyor, GA Brown) | | | | | 14 Jan 1916 - 17 Jul 1916 |
| item | 821/6 | Messrs Lawrence and Chalmer's reports on railway route from Alice Springs northwards | | | | | 24 Dec 1913 - 29 Oct 1915 |
| item | 822/6 | Report and plans of explorations and country examined south of latitude 21 degrees by Chief Surveyor | | | | | 10 Nov 1915 - 05 Jul 1916 |
| item | 868a/45 | Survey parties, May to December 1916 | | | | | 08 Apr 1916 - 13 Jul 1916 |
5 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 884/37 | Stock route, Wave Hill to Katherine, survey by Assistant Surveyor Brown | | | | | 11 May 1916 - 13 Jul 1920 |
| item | 886/55 | Public Works Committee, Melbourne; visit to NT [Northern Territory] 1916 | | | | | 25 Mar 1916 - 09 Aug 1916 |
| item | 892/L | Surveyor AJ Lane | | | | | 19 Jun 1916 - 21 Mar 1919 |
| item | 899/38 | Survey at Alligator River, Surveyor Arthur W Brockman | | | | | 19 Jul 1916 - 08 Apr 1918 |
| item | 914/37 | Fixing Crown Point leases | | | | | 06 Jan 1917 - 08 Mar 1917 |
| item | 1006/38 | David Lindsay, topographical survey east of Tennants and Barrow Creeks | | | | | 19 Aug 1884 - 03 Feb 1920 |
| item | 1012/37 | The Northern Agency Ltd, survey Katherine Reserve (telgraph), by Surveyor Power | | | | | 04 Feb 1919 - 08 Sep 1919 |