35 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | SPL15 | JD Traylen, Cancelled | | | | | 30 Jul 1956 - 15 Nov 1968 |
| item | SPL16 | Tennis Association | | | | | 30 Sep 1955 - 25 Nov 1963 |
| item | SPL19 | Peko Mines NL | | | | | 11 Jul 1956 - 17 May 1958 |
| item | SPL25 | Australian Red Cross Society | | | | | 26 Jun 1957 - 28 Mar 1961 |
| item | SPL26 | Australian Red Cross Society, cancelled all papers now on SPL162 [empty] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | SPL27 | Territory Rice Limited | | | | | 17 Apr 1957 - 28 May 1962 |
| item | SPL34 | Territory Rice Limited, Surrended | | | | | 29 Oct 1957 - 14 Jan 1959 |
| item | SPL37 | H Liddle, Forfited | | | | | 13 Nov 1957 - 31 May 1961 |
| item | SPL45 | Surrended to Crown | | | | | 10 Jun 1952 - 23 Jul 1969 |
| item | SPL46 | Australian Red Cross Society, Alice Springs | | | | | 26 Jun 1957 - 26 May 1961 |
| item | SPL50 | HG Rawle, Forfeited | | | | | 27 Jan 1959 - 23 Feb 1966 |
| item | SPL51 | K Ronberg, surrended now SPL167 | | | | | 13 Jun 1959 - 26 Nov 1976 |
| item | SPL59 | Mrs MA Carmichael, now SPL222 | | | | | c 1958 - 11 Jul 1969 |
| item | SPL68 | United Church Children's Hostel | | | | | 08 Jul 1958 - 13 Nov 1964 |
| item | SPL71 | MJ Toohey | | | | | 24 Aug 1959 - 11 Jun 1971 |
| item | SPL73 | SJ Mazlim | | | | | 20 Jul 1959 - 24 May 1967 |
| item | SPL76 | RN Moffatt | | | | | 05 Feb 1959 - 31 Mar 1966 |
| item | SPL77 | Works Football Club | | | | | 22 Jan 1959 - 06 Oct 1964 |
| item | SPL84 | Australian Red Cross Society (NT Division), Forfeited | | | | | 17 Dec 1960 - 02 Nov 1967 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | SPL86 | Salvation Army Hostels | | | | | 24 Nov 1959 - 13 Jan 1964 |
| item | SPL88 | LJ Kenna, Forfeited | | | | | 17 Feb 1961 - 18 Sep 1964 |
| item | SPL94 | Centralian Pastoralist Association, Forfeited | | | | | 18 May 1960 - 03 Mar 1967 |
| item | SPL95 | Boy Scouts Group Committee, 4th Darwin, Berrimah, Surrendered | | | | | 10 Oct 1960 - 19 Aug 1965 |
| item | SPL96 | JG Sawyer | | | | | 23 Feb 1961 - 06 Oct 1966 |
| item | SPL103 | K Dudson | | | | | 01 Oct 1959 - 01 Feb 1980 |
| item | SPL105 | AM France | | | | | 12 May 1961 - 09 Oct 1969 |
| item | SPL116 | Paspaley Pearling | | | | | 03 Jan 1957 - 20 Dec 1979 |
| item | SPL121 | EP Elvins, Surrended | | | | | 03 Dec 1960 - 18 Feb 1971 |
| item | SPL141 | Gove Mining and Industrial Corporation Limited | | | | | 28 Nov 1963 - 03 Jun 1966 |
| item | SPL143 | Northern Australian Show Society Inc, now SPL202 | | | | | 09 Dec 1963 - 17 Jan 1969 |
| item | SPL153 | Paspaley Pearling Company Ltd | | | | | 19 Apr 1960 - 01 Jul 1987 |
| item | SPL154 | BW Benbow | | | | | 17 Nov 1964 - 06 Oct 1966 |
| item | SPL157 | Seventh Day Adventist Church | | | | | 29 Jun 1965 - 26 Nov 1968 |