22 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | Rent Cards (Aaron, Robert Charles and Jill Margaret to Barclay, Lynette Dawn) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 03 Jun 1980 |
2 | unit | | Rent Cards (Barclay Bros Pty Ltd to Breed, Thomas Gerard) | | | | | 28 Jan 1953 - 31 May 1979 |
3 | unit | | Rent Cards (Bremmer, Colin to Centamin (No Liability)) | | | | | 16 Feb 1956 - 08 Oct 1979 |
4 | unit | | Rent Cards (Centamore, Cirino & Maria Coucetta to Corfias, John) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 01 Jul 1977 |
5 | unit | | Rent Cards (Corfield, Angela Mary Pearl to Dias, Mary Kathleen) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 08 Aug 1980 |
6 | unit | | Rent Cards (Diaz, Anthonio to Fannie Bay Bakery Pty Ltd) | | | | | 30 Sep 1941 - 29 Aug 1977 |
7 | unit | | Rent Cards (Fannie Bay Car Sale Property Ltd to Gample, George) | | | | | 24 Mar 1951 - 18 Aug 1977 |
8 | unit | | Rent Cards (Gamble, George Danzy to Hagan, Peter David) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 05 Jan 1976 |
9 | unit | | Rent Cards (Hagan, Peter John to Hood, Raymond Massey) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 28 Jan 1976 |
10 | unit | | Rent Cards (Hooft, Simon Richard to J W Dowling and Sons Pty Ltd) | | | | | 03 Jun 1953 - 16 Feb 1976 |
11 | unit | | Rent Cards (Kaatz, Kurt Erich to Lai Sa Ingue Nominees Pty Ltd) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 25 Feb 1977 |
12 | unit | | Rent Cards (Lai Jim Sion to Maitland, Peter) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 03 Jun 1980 |
13 | unit | | Rent Cards (Mair, William Edward to Moore, John William) | | | | | 30 Jun 1949 - 29 Apr 1976 |
14 | unit | | Rent Cards (Moore, Lois Cecily (with Maurice John) to McMurray, Lorraine K) | | | | | 17 Jan 1946 - 24 Aug 1979 |
15 | unit | | Rent Cards (McNab, Eric Arthut to Paradisis, Jakovos) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 13 Aug 1980 |
16 | unit | | Rent Cards (Oaradisis, Sofia to Qureshi, Saadia) | | | | | 26 Apr 1950 - 30 Sep 1977 |
17 | unit | | Rent Cards (Raaber, Heinz (with Bridget Mary O'Connor) to Rye, Wilga Mary) | | | | | 30 Oct 1941 - 21 Jul 1977 |
18 | unit | | Rent Cards (Saba, Frank to Smith, Leonard John) | | | | | 01 Jul 1947 - 24 Feb 1977 |
19 | unit | | Rent Cards (Smith, Leonard Richard to Szombathy, Frank) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 31 Jan 1981 |
20 | unit | | Rent Cards (Tabor, Valda Norma to Uzkuraitis, Gary John) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 07 Oct 1975 |
21 | unit | | Rent Cards (Vacchini, Sam John to Whitcombe, William James) | | | | | 01 Jul 1948 - 09 Feb 1976 |
22 | unit | | Rent Cards (White, Alan Bernard to Zwar, Keith Ian) | | | | | 21 Oct 1954 - 28 Oct 1989 |