175 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | 01 Jan 1942 - c 1942 |
| item | PL 101 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Andado Station - Robert D. & George W. McDill | | | | | 01 Jan 1941 - c 1957 |
| item | PL 102 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Singleton Station - James Turner | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 103 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 27/8/98 | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 104 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Delny Downs - Alex Kerr | | | | | 01 Jan 1947 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 104A | Application for Pastoral Lease - Delny Downs - J.A. Holt | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 106 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Erldunda Station - Sidney H. Stanes | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 107 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Erldunda Station - Sidney H. Stanes | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1952 |
| item | PL 109 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Bushy Park - D.W. Jordon | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 110 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Alcoota Station - Alcoota Pastoral Co. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1954 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 113 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Riddock - Kilmot Northern Webb on behalf of Webb Bros. | | | | | 01 Jan 1940 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 114 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Garden Station - James Turner | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 115 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Garden Station - James, Gertrude M. & James E. Turner | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 116A | Application for Pastoral Lease - Undoolya Station - E. A.J. Hayes | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 117 | Correspondence re: Pastoral Lease - Hermannsburg Mission | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 118 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Owen Springs Station - E. & A. J. Hayes | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 119 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Maryvale Station - R.C. H. Stott | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 120 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Doctors Stones - Robert H. Buck, Charles A. Butler & Thomas H. Rawlins | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 124 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Horseshoe Bend - A.J. Elliott | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 127 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Ambalindum Station - H. Bloomfield & Co. & A. W. Cavenagh | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1954 |
| item | PL 129 | Application for Pastoral Lease - McLaren Creek Station - N.C. Hargrave | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 131 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kurundi Station - Henty's Frew River Pastoral Co. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1938 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 133 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kurundi Station - G. Birchmore | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1943 |
| item | PL 135 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kurundi Station - G. Birchmore | | | | | 01 Jan 1958 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 139 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Neutral Junction Station -A.F. Haywood | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 140 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Singleton Station - J.K. Walsh | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 141 | Application to Transfer Leases 102c, 140c, 141c - Dowler to Walsh | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 143 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Anningie Station - James Davey | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 144 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Peake & Anningie Stations - James Davey | | | | | 01 Jan 1941 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 144 A | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Ester Station - Chas L. Carter | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 145 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Stirling Station - W.S. Brown | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1954 |
| item | PL 146 | Correspondence re: Transfer Leases 144a, 145a, 146c - Bagot to James Davey | | | | | 01 Jan 1954 - 01 Jan 1954 |
| item | PL 147 | Application for Pastoral Leases - Ti-Tree Station - Connor's Well, Ryan's Well, Ti-Tree Well, Taylor's Well | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 148 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Glen Helen & Coniston Stations - B. Bowman & B. & H.N. Bowman | | | | | 01 Jan 1949 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 151 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Napperby Station - Turner & Tilmouth | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 153 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Pine Hill Station - John R. Dowler | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 154 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 14/6/96 | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 156c | Correspondence re: Leases PL 156C & PL 655 - Webb Bros | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1961 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 158 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Neutral Junction Station -Geo E. Hayes | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 160 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Stirling Station - W. Stan Brown | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 161 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Ti-Tree Station - W. Heffernan | | | | | 01 Jan 1952 - 01 Jan 1952 |
| item | PL 161a | Application for Pastoral Lease - Woola Downs Station - I.V. Price | | | | | 01 Jan 1940 - 01 Jan 1954 |
| item | PL 162 | Correspondence re: PL 161A & PL 162 - Beryl I. Beale & C.F. Heffernan | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 163 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Wood Green Station - R.H. Purvis & K. Milne | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1961 |
| item | PL 164 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Riddock Station - Webb Bros | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 165 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Dneiper Station - Donald A. Chalmers | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 167 | Application for Pastoral Lease - McDonald Downs Station - C.V. Chalmers | | | | | 01 Jan 1938 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 168 | Application for Pastoral Lease - McDonald Downs Station - C.O. Chalmers | | | | | 01 Jan 1957 - 01 Jan 1961 |
| item | PL 169 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Utopia Station - E.H. & A. Kunoth | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 170 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Utopia Station - Alex H. McLeod | | | | | 01 Jan 1952 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 178 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Huckitta Station - Wallace S. Kidman | | | | | 01 Jan 1946 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 179 | Application for Pastoral Lease - McCavanagh Station - R.L. Coulthard & Herbert J. Kitto | | | | | 01 Jan 1947 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 179a | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kulgera Station - R.L. Coulthard | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 181 | Application to Transfer Leases PL 154, PL 187, PL 367, PL 2433 - F.N. Colsons to M. Lines | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 196 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 2/2/96 | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 198 | Correspondence re: Pastoral Lease PL 199 - Napperby Station | | | | | 01 Jan 1959 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 202 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Derry Downs Station - J.D.W. Weir | | | | | 01 Jan 1940 - 01 Jan 1946 |
| item | PL 203 | Correspondence re: Pastoral Lease PL 203c, 181, 458 - Peel River Land & Mineral Co. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 209 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Doreen Station - William W. Braitling | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 210 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Doreen Station - William W. Braitling | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 211 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Doreen Station - William W. Braitling | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 216 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Angus Downs Station - Harold Liddle | | | | | 01 Jan 1949 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 221 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Tempe Downs Station - F.A. & A.M. Hince | | | | | 01 Jan 1940 - 01 Jan 1953 |
| item | PL 329 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Deep Well Station - B.H. & R.B. Oldfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1947 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 330 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Henbury Station - Managing Agents Executor, Trustee & Agency Co. of S.A. | | | | | 01 Jan 1947 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 331 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Palmer Valley - Hasting Diesels Pty Ltd | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 334 | Correspondence re: Pastoral Lease - Henbury Station - Hasting Deering (N.T.) Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 335 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Idracowra Station - L. J. Murphy | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 353 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Loves Creek - Lewis Bloomfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1941 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 372 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Willowra Station - James Wickham | | | | | 01 Jan 1940 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 381 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Bond Springs Station - I.D. Sargood | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 382 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Yambah Station - Jack H. Gorey | | | | | 01 Jan 1949 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 383a | Application to Transfer Lease PL 383a - Yambah Station - T.E. & G. W. Gorey to Jack H. Gorey | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 417 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Narwietooma Station - E.J. Connellan | | | | | 01 Jan 1946 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 418 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Tierwent Station - A.E. Bullen & R.A. Brummell | | | | | 01 Jan 1941 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 421 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Simpson Gap Station - R.C. Darken | | | | | 01 Jan 1941 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 441 | Correspondence re: Pastoral Lease PL 441- Mt. Cavenagh Station - M.E. Lowe | | | | | 01 Jan 1958 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 433 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Glen Helen - Bryan Brown | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 435 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Loves Creek Station - H. Bloomfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1958 - 01 Jan 1961 |
| item | PL 442 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kulgera Station - Herbert J. Kitto & H.G. Busioe & R.L. Coulthard | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1958 |
3 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 443 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Umbearra Station - K.H. Harris & J. Russell | | | | | 01 Jan 1948 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 446 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Lilla Creek - A. McPherson | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 447 | Application to Tranfer Leases PL 127 & PL 447 - A.W. Cavenagh to H.J. Bloomfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1954 |
| item | PL 460 | Application for Pastoral Lease - McDonald Downs Station - C.O. Chalmers | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 461 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Ammaroo Station - G.V. Morton | | | | | 01 Jan 1949 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 462 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Derry Downs Station - J.C. Weir | | | | | 01 Jan 1952 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 463 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Ilumric - J.H. & F.A. Driver | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 464 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Lucy Creek Station - Colin K. Matheson & E.A. & G. Isaacson | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 465 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Ooratippra Station - K.M. Hall | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 466 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Hamilton Downs Station - Davis Bros. | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1950 |
| item | PL 467 | Application to Transfer Leases PL154/187/367/2433 - F.N. Colson to M. Lines | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 470 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Love Creek Station - H. Bloomfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1954 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 471 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Deep Well Station - V.C. Oldfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 472 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Orange Creek Station - Ronald B. Oldfield & Richard H. Jenkins | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 473 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt Denison - Leo Martin | | | | | 01 Jan 1954 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 476 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Victory Downs Station - C.V. & P.J. Morton | | | | | 01 Jan 1958 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 481 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Palmer Valley - Hasting Diesels Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 482 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt Quin Station - Hasting Diesels Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1949 - 01 Jan 1953 |
| item | PL 483 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt Ebenezer - E. Kunoth | | | | | 01 Jan 1952 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 484 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Angas Downs - M. & H.. Liddle | | | | | 01 Jan 1952 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 489 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Curtin Springs Station - O.C. Andrews and G.R. Ware | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 491 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Willowra Station - John Parkinson & Edgar L. Parkinson | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 492 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Alice Springs - Block 494 - James Davey | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 493 | Correspondence re: Pastoral Lease PL 493 - T.E. & G.W. Gorey | | | | | 01 Jan 1952 - 01 Jan 1954 |
| item | PL 495 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Marqua Station - James R. Brown | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 496 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Alice Springs - Block 369 - William Petrick | | | | | 01 Jan 1950 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 498 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Alice Springs - Block 371 - William Hese | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 499 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Utopia - John N. Nelson & Alexander McLeod | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 500 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Murray Downs Station - Burge D. Brown | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 502 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Alice Springs - Block 375 - Frederick A. Harris | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1951 |
| item | PL 505 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Orange Creek Station - Ronald B. Oldfield & Richard H. Jenkins | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 506 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Deep Well Station - V.C. Oldfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 508 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Central Mount Wedge - W.J. Waudby | | | | | 01 Jan 1957 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 510 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Allambi - Bland Oldfield | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1956 |
| item | PL 511 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Todd River Station - D.W. Pye | | | | | 01 Jan 1954 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 513 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Indiana - W.J. Bird & Sons | | | | | 01 Jan 1954 - 01 Jan 1961 |
| item | PL 515 | Application to Surrender Pastoral Lease - A.J. Gorey & A. T. Hillier | | | | | 01 Jan 1953 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 522 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Montejinni Station - W.J. & V.E.B. Crowson | | | | | 01 Jan 1969 - 01 Jan 1975 |
| item | PL 523 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Camfield Station - Vandeleur Investments Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1968 - 01 Jan 1974 |
4 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 525 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Manbulloo Station - Manbulloo & Helen Springs Pty Ltd | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 526 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Nutwood Downs - Nutwood Pastoral Co. Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 527 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mistake Creek/Kirkimbie - Ord River Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 528 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Waterloo/Limbunya - Waterloo Pastoral Co. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 534 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Alice Springs - Block 467 - E.J. Connellan | | | | | 01 Jan 1956 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 550 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Inverway Station | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1977 |
| item | PL 552 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Auvergne Station - Connor, Doherty & Durack Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 556 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Tennant Creek - Constantine Perry | | | | | 01 Jan 1968 - 01 Jan 1974 |
| item | PL 558 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Wallamunga Station - Peter Sherwin | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 559 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Birrindudu Station - North West Trading Co. Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 568 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Bullo River Station - Bullo River Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 593 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Elsey Station - The Elsey Station Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1966 - 01 Jan 1972 |
| item | PL 597 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Coolibah Station - Coolibah Pastoral Co. Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 611 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Calvert Hills - Dr. H.A. Fisher | | | | | 01 Jan 1970 - 01 Jan 1974 |
| item | PL 613 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Hodgson Downs - Hodgson Downs Limited | | | | | 01 Jan 1969 - 01 Jan 1973 |
| item | PL 618 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 28/7/98 | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | PL 642 pt. 1 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Tanumbirini Station - David Holdings Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1961 - 01 Jan 1974 |
| item | PL 642 pt. 2 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Tanumbirini Station - Tanumbirini Pastoral Co. Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1967 - 01 Jan 1979 |
| item | PL 657 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Urapunga Station - R.A. Fryer | | | | | 01 Jan 1975 - 01 Jan 1975 |
| item | PL 663 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Balbirini Station - Balbirini Management Pty Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1966 - 01 Jan 1973 |
| item | PL 664 | Application for Pastoral Lease - McArthur River - McArthur River Cattle Co. | | | | | 01 Jan 1971 - 01 Jan 1963 |
| item | PL 665 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Maryfield Station - G. W. Crossing | | | | | 01 Jan 1965 - 01 Jan 1975 |
5 | unit | | | | | | | 01 Jan 1940 - c 1960 |
| item | PL 680 pt. 1 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 20/1/97 | | | | | 01 May 1940 - c 1941 |
| item | PL 680 pt. 2 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 20/1/97 | | | | | c 1950 - c 1950 |
| item | PL 680 pt. 3 | Dept of Lands Retrieved 20/1/97 | | | | | 29 Aug 1959 - 01 Sep 1959 |
| item | PL 679 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Legune Station - Hooker Pastoral Co. Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 686 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Bing Bong Station - Wilfred F. Marshal & Edward M. Smith | | | | | 01 Jan 1966 - 01 Jan 1972 |
| item | PL 693 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Cox River Station - Gladys Carruth | | | | | 01 Jan 1971 - 01 Jan 1971 |
| item | PL 699 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kalala Station - N.B. Hunt | | | | | 01 Jan 1972 - 01 Jan 1974 |
| item | PL 700 | Application for Pastoral Lease - St. Vidgeon Station - B.G.L. Killen | | | | | 01 Jan 1973 - 01 Jan 1974 |
| item | PL 706 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kildurk (Amanbidji) - Kildurk Pastoral Co. Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 715 | Application for Pastoral Lease - V.R.D. Station - B.T. Tomlin & D.S. Mills | | | | | 01 Jan 1965 - 01 Jan 1965 |
| item | PL 717 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Birrimba Station - M.E. Elliott & L.J. Sweeny | | | | | 01 Jan 1973 - 01 Jan 1973 |
| item | PL 721 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Dungowan Station - Messrs. Wright & Reitana | | | | | 01 Jan 1977 - 01 Jan 1977 |
| item | PL 731 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Kiana Station - David Holdings Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1970 - 01 Jan 1973 |
| item | PL 733 pt. 3 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Shenandoah - C. Goetz | | | | | 01 Jan 1968 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 734 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Hayfield Station - C.T. Hutchins | | | | | 01 Jan 1973 - 01 Jan 1973 |
| item | PL 742 | Correspondence re: Lease PL 742 - Crowson Pastoral Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1977 - 01 Jan 1977 |
| item | PL 743 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Erldunda Station - Sidney H. Stanes | | | | | 01 Jan 1967 - 01 Jan 1968 |
| item | PL 751 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Moroak - J.L. & P. MacFarlane | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 760 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Dry River Station - D.S. Mills & B.T. Tomlin | | | | | 01 Jan 1970 - 01 Jan 1973 |
| item | PL 761 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Gorrie - B.J. Tomlin | | | | | 01 Jan 1970 - 01 Jan 1974 |
| item | PL 763 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Sunday Creek - David Holdings Pty. Ltd. | | | | | 01 Jan 1976 - 01 Jan 1976 |
| item | PL 794 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Derry Downs - Bundey River Station - D. & J.C. Weir | | | | | 01 Jan 1961 - No Date |
| item | PL 2293 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Ambalindum Station - A. W. Cavenagh | | | | | 01 Jan 1959 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 2332 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Glen Helen Station - Bryan Bowman | | | | | 01 Jan 1949 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 2380 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Neutral Junction Station - Alan Haywood | | | | | 01 Jan 1955 - 01 Jan 1955 |
| item | PL 2417 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Harper Springs Station - H. Hese | | | | | 01 Jan 1948 - 01 Jan 1958 |
| item | PL 2433 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Aileron Station - F.N. Colson & Sons | | | | | 01 Jan 1951 - 01 Jan 1959 |
| item | PL 2436 | Correspondence re: Lease PL 2436- Stirling Station | | | | | 01 Jan 1960 - 01 Jan 1960 |
| item | PL 2507 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Mt. Swan Station - W. Petrick | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1957 |
| item | PL 2517 | Application for Pastoral Lease - Harper Springs Station - Waite River Station - E.J. Dixon | | | | | 01 Jan 1939 - 01 Jan 1955 |