42 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 1 | Northern Territory Transmission, William Martin Letchford | | | | | 05 Sep 1871 - 13 Dec 1871 |
| item | 2 | Northern Territory Transmission, Peter McKechnie | | | | | 02 Nov 1871 - 12 Jun 1872 |
| item | 3 | Northern Territory Transmission, Richard Chaffrey Baker | | | | | 10 May 1864 - 12 Jun 1872 |
| item | 4 | Northern Territory Transmission, Love Hampton Atkinson | | | | | 02 Nov 1871 - 13 Sep 1872 |
| item | 5 | Northern Territory Transmission, Emma Mary Ann Bloxam | | | | | 19 Nov 1871 - 02 Apr 1873 |
| item | 6 | Northern Territory Transmission, Emma Hall | | | | | 02 Nov 1871 - 20 May 1873 |
| item | 7 | Northern Territory Transmission, Mary Boase | | | | | 02 Nov 1871 - 11 Jul 1873 |
| item | 8 | Northern Territory Transmission, Elizabeth Patient Burrowes | | | | | 04 Jul 1872 - 17 Jul 1873 |
| item | 9 | Northern Territory Transmission, William Gregory Luxmoore | | | | | 19 Nov 1871 - 14 Nov 1873 |
| item | 10 | Northern Territory Transmission, John Playford | | | | | 07 Nov 1871 - 27 Nov 1873 |
| item | 11 | Northern Territory Transmission, Hugo Carl Emil Muecke | | | | | 28 Oct 1871 - 19 Nov 1873 |
| item | 12 | Northern Territory Transmission, Joshua Gibson, Robert Harvey and William James Barrett | | | | | 19 Dec 1867 - 21 Jan 1874 |
| item | 13 | Northern Territory Transmission, Benjamin Daw | | | | | 28 Oct 1871 - 11 Mar 1874 |
| item | 14 | Northern Territory Transmission, Ellen Targett | | | | | 29 Aug 1871 - 29 Jul 1874 |
| item | 15 | Northern Territory Transmission, William Henry Jones | | | | | 02 Feb 1870 - 29 Jul 1874 |
| item | 16 | Northern Territory Transmission, Elizabeth Hinton | | | | | 20 Oct 1871 - 10 Sep 1874 |
| item | 17 | Northern Territory Transmission, James Menpes | | | | | 07 Nov 1871 - 15 Dec 1874 |
| item | 18 | Northern Territory Transmission, Charles Rischbieth | | | | | 22 Oct 1873 - 19 Oct 1875 |
| item | 19 | Northern Territory Transmission, Thomas Bennett | | | | | 04 May 1870 - 20 Dec 1875 |
| item | 20 | Northern Territory Transmission, Catherine Maughan | | | | | 14 Oct 1871 - 06 Aug 1876 |
| item | 21 | Northern Territory Transmission, Isabella Baker | | | | | 06 Nov 1871 - 05 Sep 1876 |
| item | 22 | Northern Territory Transmission, John Sadler Challoner, John Dixon Challoner and Joseph Priestman Atkinson | | | | | 08 Nov 1871 - 05 Sep 1876 |
| item | 23 | Northern Territory Transmission, Oliver Horner | | | | | 02 Nov 1871 - 17 Oct 1876 |
| item | 24 | Northern Territory Transmission, Abraham Lindo Mocatta, David Mocatta, Samuel Mocatta and Isaac Lindo Mocatta | | | | | 28 Nov 1871 - 01 Nov 1876 |
| item | 25 | Northern Territory Transmission, Harriett Staker | | | | | 01 Sep 1876 - 24 Sep 1877 |
| item | 26 | Northern Territory Transmission, Martha Dehane | | | | | 28 Oct 1871 - 04 Jan 1877 |
| item | 27 | Northern Territory Transmission, Therese Schulz | | | | | 04 Dec 1871 - 10 Jan 1877 |
| item | 28 | Northern Territory Transmission, James Smith, George Shaw and Daniel Keckwick | | | | | 29 Aug 1871 - 11 May 1877 |
| item | 29 | Northern Territory Transmission, Hiram Mildred | | | | | 07 Nov 1871 - 21 Jun 1877 |
| item | 30 | Northern Territory Transmission, Sir Henry Ayers, Caleb Peacock, Alexander Hay and John Mann | | | | | 06 Nov 1873 - 30 Oct 1877 |
| item | 31 | Northern Territory Transmission, Handyside Duncan, Charles Marryat and George Wright-Hawkes | | | | | 24 Dec 1859 - 30 Nov 1877 |
| item | 32 | Northern Territory Transmission, Elizabeth Butterfield | | | | | 14 Oct 1871 - 07 Dec 1877 |
| item | 33 | Northern Territory Transmission, Charles Rischbieth | | | | | 29 Apr 1875 - 17 Jan 1878 |
| item | 34 | Northern Territory Transmission, Thomas Frederick Reynolds | | | | | 03 Nov 1875 - 21 Feb 1878 |
| item | 35 | Northern Territory Transmission, Thomas Frederick Reynolds | | | | | 28 Oct 1871 - 13 Mar 1878 |
| item | 36 | Northern Territory Transmission, Harold Mayo Addison | | | | | 19 Nov 1871 - 26 Apr 1878 |
| item | 37 | Northern Territory Transmission, Arthur Richman Addison | | | | | 19 Nov 1871 - 26 Apr 1878 |
| item | 38 | Northern Territory Transmission, George Cooke | | | | | 04 Dec 1871 - 10 May 1878 |
| item | 39 | Northern Territory Transmission, Charles Emanuel Leonino and Arthur David Leonino | | | | | 14 Oct 1871 - 26 Dec 1878 |
| item | 40 | Northern Territory Transmission, JL Daniel [empty envelope] | | | | | 13 Apr 1879 - 29 May 1879 |
| item | 41 | Northern Territory Transmission, SJ Luttrelltin [empty envelope] | | | | | 09 Jan 1879 - 17 Feb 1879 |