22 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL1915 | [Anderson Holdings] | [Tarlton Downs Station and Manners Creek Station] | | | | 03 Feb 1964 - 24 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2040 | JL Timperon; Gurner [Station], Coppock, land claim area | | | | | 03 Jan 1973 - 23 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2049 | W [Willy, Willie] Smith | [Todd Rivers Downs Station] | | | | 04 Jul 1956 - 12 Mar 1986 |
| item | GL2051 | AR [Richard] Apel, [James Bruce and Lynette] Crowson | [Palmer Valley Station] | | | | 06 Jul 1960 - 02 Aug 1979 |
| item | GL2051 | J.B. [James Bruce] Crowson, Numery [Station] | | | | | 26 Jul 1948 - 24 Nov 1980 |
| item | GL2066 | Phillip Creek Station; RM Cadzow Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | | | | | 30 Jun 1979 - 26 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2067 | Tennant Creek Pastoral Company Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | | | | | 18 Apr 1979 - 24 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2070 | Schmidt, J [Josef] | [Tennant Creek area] | | | | 28 Oct 1978 - 26 Sep 1996 |
| item | GL2072 | Tempe Downs Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | | | | | 06 Jun 1979 - 19 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2086 | Curtin Springs Station | [Peter Severin] | | | | 19 Feb 1979 - 04 Dec 1979 |
| item | GL2097 | [Banka Banka Station] | | | | | 30 Nov 1970 - 18 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2103 | Collins | [Ringwood Station] | | | | 11 Aug 1980 - 18 Feb 1999 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL2106 | MacLaren Nominees Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | [MacLaren Creek Station] | | | | 27 Jun 1977 - 18 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2116 | Tennant Creek Pastoral Company Pty Ltd [Proprietary Limited] | [Tennant Creek Station] | | | | 05 Nov 1988 - 22 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2122 | Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Organisation (CSIRO); lot 4573, Alice Springs | | | | | 10 Sep 1981 - 22 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2143 | Grazing licence for Miss White | [Alice Springs area] | | | | 11 Oct 1985 - 22 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2144 | K Pick, 2006 km [kilometres squared], south of Numery | [Todd Rivers Downs Station] | | | | 07 Mar 1986 - 19 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL2155 | Grazing licence over part lots 2087 and 2088, Tennant Creek; Josef Schmidt | | | | | 24 Sep 1996 - 18 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL3002 | Grazing licence over Animbra common and quarantine reserve | [Adjoining south of Kurundi Station] | | | | 27 Jan 1988 - 19 Feb 1999 |
| item | GL3003 | Lot 4573, Heath Road; CSIRO [Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Organisation], Alice Springs | | | | | 23 Jan 1992 - 19 Feb 1999 |