37 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | 4 | Daniels, David; lease for wharf and sawmill, Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1886 - 01 Jan 1886 |
| item | 5 | Solomon, Vaiben Louis; Whitelaw, Edgar Howard; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 6 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 26 Nov 1889 |
| item | 6 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 7 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 7 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 8 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 26 Nov 1889 |
| item | 8 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 9 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 26 Nov 1889 |
| item | 9 | Ah How; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 10 | Ah Lat; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 31 Dec 1889 |
| item | 10 | Ah Lat; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 11 | Ah How; Ah Ti; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 11 | Ah How; Ah Ti; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 12 | Ah Ti; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 12 | Ah Ti; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 13 | Hillson, John Corber; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 13 | Hillson, John Corber; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [Crown lease] | | | | | 22 Oct 1889 - 22 Oct 1889 |
| item | 13 | Hillson, John Corber; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [Crown lease] | | | | | 22 Oct 1889 - 22 Oct 1889 |
| item | 13 | Hillson, John Corber; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 14 | Sung Lee; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 01 Jan 1887 |
| item | 14 | Sung Lee; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [not executed] | | | | | 01 Jan 1887 - 31 Dec 1889 |
| item | 16 | Ah San; lease for gardening purposes; Doctors' Gully, Palmerston [Darwin], Crown lease | | | | | 14 Jan 1889 - 30 Sep 1895 |
| item | 17 | Ah Ti; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 26 Sep 1890 - 08 Dec 1890 |
| item | 18 | Sung Lee; lease for gardening purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 26 Sep 1890 - 08 Dec 1890 |
| item | 20 | Kit San Yon; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 22 May 1894 - 22 May 1894 |
| item | 20 | Kit San Yon; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot [cancelled] | | | | | 22 May 1894 - 04 Mar 1895 |
| item | 21 | Dudeney, Henry; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 22 May 1894 - 30 Sep 1900 |
| item | 22 | Gee Sung; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 13 Mar 1895 - 10 Mar 1896 |
| item | 26 | Stevens, Hildebrand William Havelock; Crown lease for special purposes; Croker Island, north coast | | | | | 23 Nov 1899 - 30 Mar 1904 |
| item | 26 | Stevens, Hildebrand William Havelock; Crown lease for special purposes; Croker Island, north coast | | | | | 23 Nov 1899 - 18 Jan 1900 |
| item | 27 | Phillips, Edward George; Crown lease for special purposes; north Goulburn Island | | | | | 01 Sep 1900 - 01 Sep 1900 |
| item | 28 | Phillips, Edward George; Crown lease for special purposes; south Goulburn Island | | | | | 01 Sep 1900 - 01 Sep 1900 |
| item | 29 | Kwong San Yon; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 19 Oct 1900 - 05 Jan 1901 |
| item | 32 | Yet Cone Saw; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 24 Nov 1904 - 24 Nov 1904 |
| item | 33 | Kwong San Yon; Crown lease for special purposes; Hundred of Bagot | | | | | 15 Jan 1908 - 15 Jan 1908 |