12 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | ML 6 | Methodist Church of Aust [Australia], Yirrkala | | | | | 18 Oct 1935 - 03 May 1974 |
| item | ML 7 | Mission Lease, Port Keats | | | | | 24 Jan 1939 - 06 Feb 1970 |
| item | ML 8 | [Mission Lease, Melville Island] | | | | | 15 Apr 1940 - 26 Feb 1973 |
| item | ML 9 | [Mission Lease, Roper River] | | | | | 05 Jun 1908 - 19 Sep 1967 |
| item | ML 11 | Methodist Overseas Missions, Croker Island | | | | | 05 Dec 1944 - 14 Dec 1976 |
| item | ML 12 | MOM [Methodist Overseas Missions], Elcho Island | | | | | 24 Oct 1945 - 14 Dec 1976 |
| item | ML 13 | MOM [Methodist Overseas Missions], Milingimbi, Crocodile Islands | | | | | 26 Oct 1943 - 22 Feb 1978 |
| item | ML 17 | CMS [Church Missionary Society], Oenpelli | | | | | 23 Apr 1925 - 14 Dec 1976 |
| item | ML 18 | CMS [Church Missionary Society], Groote Eylandt | | | | | 23 Oct 1936 - 18 Mar 1977 |
| item | ML 19 | Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Darwin Incorporated [Santa Teresa Mission] | | | | | 11 Sep 1952 - 04 Jan 1978 |
| item | ML 20 | [Mission Lease] Bathurst Island | | | | | 31 Mar 1953 - 18 Mar 1977 |