208 Records found.
Unit | Item | Description | Description 2 | Description 3 | Description 4 | Description 5 | Image Location | Date Range |
1 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 741 | [Grant, William] | Barkly Tableland | | | | 17 Jan 1956 - 17 Jan 1956 |
| item | GL 790 | [Anderson, WG and A] | Tobermorey Station | | | | 27 May 1948 - 27 May 1948 |
| item | GL 991B | [Coppock, Gilbert] | Gilbeanie Station | | | | 15 Dec 1949 - 14 Nov 1951 |
| item | GL 1069 | [Boon, SA] | Barkly Tableland | | | | 12 Oct 1955 - 11 Jul 1958 |
| item | GL 1081 | [Bloomfield, Baden] | Indianna Station | | | | 26 May 1948 - 20 Oct 1950 |
| item | GL 1160 | [Woods, Harold Keith] | London Downs Station | | | | 29 Mar 1949 - 27 Nov 1956 |
| item | GL 1231 | [Coppock, Gilbert] | Gilbeanie Station | | | | 26 Jan 1949 - 16 Sep 1954 |
| item | GL 1236 | [Parkinson, John] | Willowra Station | | | | 30 Aug 1949 - 22 Feb 1954 |
| item | GL 1242 | [Woods, Harold Keith] | London Downs Station | | | | 10 Jan 1956 - 23 Nov 1956 |
| item | GL 1258 | [Woods, Harold Keith] | London Downs Station | | | | 07 Dec 1950 - 09 Jul 1956 |
| item | GL 1267 | [Bokara Pastoral Company] | | | | | 18 Jun 1948 - 24 Dec 1952 |
| item | GL 1269 | [Leonard, HV] | | | | | 28 Mar 1951 - 17 Apr 1951 |
| item | GL 1298 | Bland, H Oldfield | Inglegarra | | | | 26 Jul 1948 - 13 May 1953 |
| item | GL 1325 | [Bullen, AE] | | | | | 21 Jun 1951 - 11 Jul 1951 |
| item | GL 1352 | [Pope, Arthur Lawrence] | | | | | 11 Jan 1949 - 03 Apr 1951 |
| item | GL 1356 | [McGuire, Ken] | Lake Surprise Station | | | | 25 May 1949 - 11 Jan 1950 |
| item | GL 1357 | [Underdown, LGR and McAskill, J] | | | | | 01 Apr 1949 - 20 Jun 1949 |
| item | GL 1359 | [Coppock, Gilbert] | Gilbeanie Station | | | | 14 Feb 1949 - 26 Mar 1953 |
| item | GL 1372 | [Waudby, William Johnston] | Central Mount Wedge Station | | | | 18 Nov 1949 - 24 Jun 1953 |
| item | GL 1376 | [Hall, Kingsley M] | Ooratippra Station | | | | 23 Sep 1949 - 28 Mar 1951 |
| item | GL 1378 | [Harris, Frederick Arthur] | | | | | 02 Jun 1948 - 07 Nov 1949 |
| item | GL 1380 | [Ragonesi, Domenico] | | | | | 16 May 1949 - 11 Nov 1949 |
| item | GL 1381 | [Hague, RJ] | | | | | 17 Nov 1949 - 21 Apr 1952 |
| item | GL 1384 | [empty file] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1388 | [Anderson, Alexander] | Tobermorey Station | | | | 15 Nov 1949 - 04 Jan 1950 |
| item | GL 1396 | [Milnes, Ken] | | | | | 18 Jan 1950 - 01 Apr 1954 |
| item | GL 1404 | [Driver, John H] | Elkedra Station | | | | 02 Aug 1950 - 04 Jun 1957 |
| item | GL 1410 | [Dalhousie Pastoral Company Limited] | Anacoora | | | | 11 Aug 1950 - 16 Nov 1954 |
| item | GL 1422 | [Davey, James] | Anningie Station | | | | 22 Dec 1950 - 13 Sep 1954 |
| item | GL 1447 | [Rawlins TH] | Anningie Station | | | | 13 Mar 1952 - 12 Sep 1955 |
| item | GL 1449 | [Sprigg, and Smith, Messrs] | Plenty Downs | | | | 19 Dec 1951 - 12 Nov 1954 |
| item | GL 1451 | [McArthur, Donald Arthur] | | | | | 15 May 1952 - 13 Dec 1956 |
| item | GL 1462 | [Clough, MA] | Epenarra Station | | | | 24 Jun 1954 - 05 Feb 1958 |
| item | GL 1463 | [Brown, BD] | | | | | 10 Nov 1953 - 20 Nov 1953 |
| item | GL 1471 | [Hayward, Alan F] | Neutral Junction Station | | | | 15 Jan 1953 - 23 Jul 1957 |
| item | GL 1472 | [Pope, Arthur Lawrence] | | | | | 03 Feb 1953 - 01 Apr 1954 |
| item | GL 1473 | [Fitzroy, E and Hague, DT and Hague, IT] | Bokara Station | | | | 03 Feb 1953 - 24 Mar 1955 |
| item | GL 1477 | [empty file cover] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1480 | [Turner, WA] | Hale River | | | | 14 Jul 1953 - 20 Nov 1957 |
| item | GL 1481 | [Smith, Reginald Gordon] | Ambalindum Station | | | | 23 Jun 1953 - 11 Jul 1955 |
| item | GL 1483 | [Hayes, Edward and Anne Jane and Hayes, Edward (junior)] | | | | | 13 Mar 1953 - 20 Aug 1953 |
| item | GL 1486 | [Pope, Arthur Lawrence] | | | | | 17 Mar 1952 - 08 Oct 1953 |
| item | GL 1489 | Scheid, P [Phillip] E [Edward] | Andado Station | | | | 14 Aug 1953 - 11 Sep 1953 |
| item | GL 1491 | | Loves Creek and Todd | | | | 23 Feb 1954 - 04 Mar 1954 |
| item | GL 1493 | [Harris, Frederick Arthur] | | | | | 10 Oct 1955 - 26 Oct 1955 |
| item | GL 1494 | [Webb Bros] | Mt. Riddock Station | | | | 05 Mar 1954 - 09 Jun 1955 |
| item | GL 1495 | Rawlins, TH | | | | | 25 Mar 1954 - 09 Apr 1954 |
| item | GL 1497 | [Parkinson, John] | Willowra Station | | | | 26 Nov 1953 - 17 May 1954 |
| item | GL 1499 | [Miller, Ronald Nevil Damien and Willick, Milton and Calder, Stephen Edward] | Argadarda Station | | | | 14 May 1954 - 07 Nov 1960 |
| item | GL 1505 | [Allen, Peter Herbert] | Ambalindum Station | | | | 27 Apr 1954 - 10 Mar 1955 |
| item | GL 1506 | [empty file] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1511 | [Bloomfield, P] | | | | | 16 Aug 1954 - 01 Nov 1954 |
| item | GL 1514 | [Coppock, Gilbert] | Gibeanie Station | | | | 10 Sep 1954 - 09 Feb 1959 |
| item | GL 1515 | [Mount Denison Proprietors Limited] | Mount Denison Station | | | | 19 Aug 1954 - 31 Jan 1956 |
| item | GL 1526 | [Davey, James] | Anningie Station | | | | 15 Nov 1954 - 12 Apr 1957 |
| item | GL 1527 | [Brown, Burge Dawson] | | | | | 15 Nov 1954 - 23 Nov 1954 |
| item | GL 1529 | [Hayward, Alan Frederick] | Neutral Junction Station | | | | 17 Nov 1954 - 29 Nov 1954 |
| item | GL 1532 | [Mortimer, Harrold James and Scheid, Phillip Edward] | Andado Station | | | | 19 Nov 1954 - 20 Oct 1955 |
| item | GL 1542 | [Bullen, Austin Edmund] | | | | | 22 Feb 1955 - 14 Mar 1955 |
| item | GL 1544 | [Mortimer, Harrold James and Scheid, Phillip Edward] | | | | | 01 Mar 1955 - 20 Oct 1955 |
| item | GL 1545 | [Mortimer, Harrold James and Scheid, Phillip Edward] | | | | | 01 Mar 1955 - 28 Apr 1955 |
| item | GL 1540 | [empty file] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1534 | [Gagliardi, Giuseppe] | | | | | 17 Aug 1954 - 11 Apr 1957 |
| item | GL 1539 | [Pick, Richard Henry] | | | | | 17 Jan 1955 - 02 Feb 1955 |
2 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1546 | [empty file cover] | see LA7/90 | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1548 | Turner, W [William] A [Alfred] | PL 557 | | | | 21 Feb 1955 - 29 Mar 1957 |
| item | GL 1549 | Isaacson, E [Edwin] A [Alfred] and Isaacson, G [George] | Lucy Creek Station | | | | 30 Mar 1955 - 19 Sep 1958 |
| item | GL 1550 | [Brown, James Roy] | Marqua Station | | | | 14 Mar 1955 - 18 Jun 1955 |
| item | GL 1551 | [empty file cover] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1560 | [McArthur, Donald Arthur] | | | | | 27 Jul 1955 - 25 Sep 1957 |
| item | GL 1564 | [Kenna, Leslie Joseph] | | | | | 01 Sep 1955 - 27 Oct 1959 |
| item | GL 1566 | [Conway, Mortimer and Williams, Thomas and Tucker, Patrick] | | | | | 10 Jul 1955 - 30 Sep 1955 |
| item | GL 1567 | [Walsh, John Kerwick] | Singleton Station | | | | 05 Sep 1955 - 16 Oct 1955 |
| item | GL 1568 | [Walsh, John Kerwick] | Singleton Station | | | | 17 Aug 1955 - 06 Oct 1955 |
| item | GL 1570 | [empty file cover] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1576 | [Hall, Kingsley M] | Ooratippra Station | | | | 17 Aug 1955 - 18 Apr 1957 |
| item | GL 1577 | [Andado Pastoral Co. Ltd.] | | | | | 24 Oct 1955 - 17 Nov 1955 |
| item | GL 1578 | [Andado Pastoral Co. Ltd.] | | | | | 24 Oct 1955 - 28 Jun 1957 |
| item | GL 1579 | [Andado Pastoral Co. Ltd.] | | | | | 24 Oct 1955 - 15 Feb 1956 |
| item | GL 1582 | Ross, G [Gordon] S [Stuart] and Staughton, S [Samuel] T [Thomas] | | | | | 10 Jan 1956 - 07 Feb 1956 |
| item | GL 1583 | Walsh, J [John] K [Kerkwick] | Singleton Station | | | | 11 Sep 1955 - 16 Jan 1958 |
| item | GL 1586 | Traylen, J [James] D [David] | | | | | 26 Apr 1956 - 01 May 1956 |
| item | GL 1589 | Fitzgerald, Arthur and Chichester,George Beresford | | | | | 12 Apr 1956 - 29 Aug 1956 |
| item | GL 1590 | [Bird, William James and Bird, James Frederick and Bird, Thomas Alfred Henry] | Indianna Station | | | | 26 Apr 1956 - 04 Jun 1956 |
| item | GL 1594 | Waudby, W [William] J [Johnston] | Central Mount Wedge Station | | | | 22 Feb 1955 - 09 Jul 1956 |
| item | GL 1600 | Donald, Jack | | | | | 27 Apr 1956 - 07 Nov 1958 |
| item | GL 1604 | Clough, M [Maxwell] A [Albert] | Epenarra Station | | | | 03 Jul 1956 - 21 Nov 1956 |
| item | GL 1606 | Donald, J [Jack] | | | | | 15 Nov 1956 - 08 Aug 1957 |
| item | GL 1610 | Traylen, James David | | | | | 16 Jan 1957 - 01 Aug 1958 |
| item | GL 1612 | Brown, J [James] R [Roy] and Brown, A [Archibald] M [Mervyn] and Brown, G [George] A [Allan] | Marqua Station | | | | 22 Jan 1957 - 26 Aug 1958 |
| item | GL 1615 | [Clanchy, J [John] V Valentine] | Kamaran Downs Station | | | | 26 Mar 1957 - 14 Oct 1957 |
| item | GL 1617 | Andado Pastoral Company Limited | | | | | 04 Jul 1957 - 14 Aug 1957 |
| item | GL 1622 | Walsh, John Kerwick | Singleton Station | | | | 21 Oct 1957 - 15 Jan 1958 |
| item | GL 1626 | Mount Denison Proprietors Limited | | | | | 02 Sep 1957 - 08 Nov 1957 |
| item | GL 1627 | Allen, Peter and Allen, Thomas Joseph and Allen, Leslie Patrick | | | | | 19 Aug 1957 - 18 Jun 1958 |
| item | GL 1628 | Rieck, Arnold Frederick and Rieck, Richard George and Rieck, Walter Edward | | | | | 09 Sep 1957 - 16 Jun 1959 |
| item | GL 1629 | Smith, Walter | | | | | 19 Sep 1957 - 03 Mar 1960 |
| item | GL 1634 | Miller, Willick and Calder | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1635 | Cole, J [Joseph] P [Payne] and Anderson, D [Donald] A [Alexander] | | | | | 23 Sep 1957 - 19 Dec 1957 |
| item | GL 1636 | Colson, Frederick Jack | | | | | 11 Jun 1957 - 21 Sep 1961 |
| item | GL 1637 | Andado Pastoral Co Ltd | | | | | 31 Jul 1957 - 30 Dec 1957 |
| item | GL 1638 | Petrick, William | Mt. Swan Station | | | | 11 Dec 1957 - 10 Dec 1959 |
| item | GL 1641 | Turner, WA | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1642 | [Conway, Mortimer] | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1644 | Waudby, William Johnson | | | | | 10 Jan 1958 - 19 May 1958 |
| item | GL 1649 | [empty file cover] | see GL 1814 | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1652 | [Walsh, John Kerwick and Walsh, Pamela Ellen and Bartlett, Cecil Annadale] | | | | | 02 Apr 1958 - 10 Jun 1958 |
| item | GL 1655 | Kurundi Cattle Co | Kurundi Station | | | | 24 Jun 1958 - 27 Aug 1958 |
| item | GL 1658 | [Bartlett, Cecil Alexander and Walsh, John Kerwick and Walsh, Pamella Ellen] | Singleton Station | | | | 11 Aug 1958 - 26 Aug 1958 |
3 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1660 | [Boon, Sidney Albert] | | | | | 30 Jun 1958 - 05 May 1961 |
| item | GL 1671 | [Elders Trustee and Executor Company Limited and Parkinson, Alice[ | Willowra Station | | | | 29 Sep 1958 - 11 Dec 1958 |
| item | GL 1672 | Bloomfield, Mary Paulina | Loves Creek | | | | 10 Oct 1958 - 15 Oct 1958 |
| item | GL 1676 | Brown, James Roy and Brown, Archibald Mervyn and Brown,George Allan | Marqua Station | | | | 10 Oct 1958 - 09 Nov 1958 |
| item | GL1677 | [empty file cover] | see GL1805 | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1678 | Brown, William Standley | Annitowa Station | | | | 15 Oct 1958 - 30 Oct 1958 |
| item | GL 1680 | Hayes, Edward and Hayes, Jean Lillian | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1682 | Conway, Mortimer | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1683 | Turner, William Alfred | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1691 | Hall, Kingsley Meyrick | | | | | 20 Nov 1958 - 09 Dec 1958 |
| item | GL 1696 | [Hayward, Alan Frederick] | Neutral Junction Station | | | | 25 Nov 1958 - 10 Dec 1958 |
| item | GL 1700 | Michael, Ian Donovan | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1705 | Traylen, James David | | | | | 18 Dec 1958 - 17 Aug 1959 |
| item | GL 1708 | Mt Denison Proprietors Ltd | | | | | 18 Dec 1958 - 31 Jul 1959 |
| item | GL 1710 | Annacoora Ltd | Mt. Dare Station | | | | 08 Jan 1959 - 21 Nov 1973 |
| item | GL 1712 | Braitling, Doreen Rose | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1715 | Brandt, Sven Gustav | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1717 | Isaacson, Edwin Alfred and Isaacson, George | Lucy Creek Station | | | | 05 Oct 1958 - 26 May 1961 |
| item | GL 1721 | Hayward, Alan Frederick | Neutral Junction Station | | | | 13 Aug 1957 - 24 Mar 1959 |
| item | GL 1722 | Devery, Lesley Walter | | | | | 11 Nov 1958 - 19 Feb 1959 |
| item | GL 1723 | Pick, Richard Henry | | | | | 17 Oct 1958 - 11 Nov 1959 |
| item | GL 1725 | [empty file cover] | see GL 1795 | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1726 | Harris, R [Reginald] R [Robert] | McLaren Creek Station | | | | 19 Jan 1959 - 03 Mar 1959 |
| item | GL 1727 | Smith, Willie | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1728 | Miller, [Ronald Nevil Damien] and Willick, [Milton] and Calder, [Stephen Edward] | | | | | 03 Sep 1957 - 12 Mar 1959 |
| item | GL 1746 | Bloomfield, Lillian Myrtle and Bloomfield, Henry Justus Lewis | | | | | 27 Aug 1959 - 27 Nov 1959 |
| item | GL 1750 | Mt Denison Proprietors Litd | | | | | 06 Aug 1959 - 22 Oct 1959 |
| item | GL 1755 | Bird, W [William] J [James] and Sons | Indianna Station | | | | 28 Jul 1959 - 28 Sep 1959 |
| item | GL 1764 | Driver, Frank Austin | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1765 | Parkinson, Edgar Lionel | Willowra Station | | | | 02 Jul 1959 - 06 Nov 1959 |
| item | GL 1766 | Turner, William Alfred | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1767 | Traylen, James David | | | | | 11 Aug 1959 - 20 Oct 1959 |
| item | GL 1768 | Dowler, John Robert | Pine Hill Station | | | | 02 Jul 1959 - 24 Aug 1960 |
| item | GL 1770 | Boon, Sidney Albert | | | | | 28 Oct 1959 - 30 Oct 1959 |
| item | GL 1773 | Petrick, W [William] H [Heinrich] F [Frederick] | Mt. Swan Station | | | | 29 Oct 1959 - 23 Dec 1959 |
| item | GL 1783 | Matthews, R [Roy] | Willowra Station | | | | 11 Dec 1959 - 19 Aug 1960 |
| item | GL 1784 | [empty file cover] | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1788 | Michael, I [Ian] D [Donovan] | | | | | 11 Sep 1957 - 08 Dec 1965 |
| item | GL 1789 | [Leonard, Hector Victor] | | | | | 25 Feb 1960 - 29 Feb 1960 |
| item | GL 1792 | Paige, KI | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1793 | Donald, S [Stuart] J [John] | Plenty River | | | | 02 Jun 1959 - 06 Jun 1961 |
| item | GL 1794 | [Rumball, Robert Peter] | Utopia Station | | | | 07 Jul 1960 - 09 May 1961 |
| item | GL 1795 | Braitling, D [Doreen] R [Rose] | Mount Doreen Station | | | | 05 May 1952 - 24 Aug 1960 |
| item | GL 1797 | Leonard, Hector Victor | Kurundi Station | | | | 24 Oct 1949 - 09 Aug 1960 |
| item | GL 1802 | Hayes, Mr and Mrs E [Edward and Jean Lillian] | Undoolya Station | | | | 03 Nov 1958 - 30 Jun 1964 |
| item | GL 1803 | Bloomfield,Mrs M [Mary] P [Paulina] | Loves Creek Station | | | | 12 Aug 1960 - 30 Aug 1960 |
| item | GL 1804 | Turner, WA | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1809 | Turner, WA | [empty file cover] | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1814 | [Driver, John Henry and Esther Joan] | | | | | 24 Apr 1958 - 25 Aug 1969 |
| item | GL 1816 | [Fitzgerald, A] | | | | | 16 Jun 1966 - 04 Jul 1966 |
4 | unit | | | | | | | No Date - No Date |
| item | GL 1819 | [Bird, William James and Bird, James Frederick] | Indianna Station | | | | 22 Sep 1960 - 02 Aug 1961 |
| item | GL 1825 | Liddle, H [Harold] | Tea-Tree Well | | | | 22 Jan 1959 - 20 Jul 1962 |
| item | GL 1826 | [Leonard, Hector Victor] | | | | | 14 Oct 1960 - 14 Oct 1960 |
| item | GL 1829 | Campbell, J [John] | | | | | 26 Aug 1960 - 02 Nov 1960 |
| item | GL 1832 | Dowler, J [John] R [Robert] | Pine Hill | | | | 18 Oct 1960 - 21 Nov 1960 |
| item | GL 1834 | Brandt, S [Sven] G[Gustav] | | | | | 07 Feb 1955 - 31 May 1972 |
| item | GL 1837 | [Perry, Ellen Marion] | | | | | 08 Nov 1960 - 11 Nov 1960 |
| item | GL 1843 | [Hayes, Stradford] | | | | | 07 Jul 1960 - 03 Oct 1963 |
| item | GL 1845 | Underdown, L [Lycurgus] J [John] R [Richard] | | | | | 11 Nov 1959 - 08 Feb 1961 |
| item | GL 1851 | [Fogarty, Edward John and Fogarty, David George] | Mulga Park Station | | | | 02 Nov 1960 - 02 Dec 1964 |
| item | GL 1855 | [Jenkinson, Standley Griffith] | Yeundumu | | | | 28 Oct 1960 - 07 Mar 1961 |
| item | GL 1862 | [Boon, Sidney Albert] | | | | | 21 Jun 1961 - 02 Jun 1966 |
| item | GL 1864 | Rogers, [Joseph] and Elliot, [Lindsay Robert] and Underwood, [Murray Arlington] | | | | | 15 Jul 1960 - 20 Jul 1964 |
| item | GL 1869 | [Andado Pastoral Company Limited] | | | | | 31 Aug 1961 - 16 Oct 1961 |
| item | GL 1872 | [Andado Pastoral Company Limited] | | | | | 07 Jun 1961 - 20 Oct 1961 |
| item | GL 1882 | [Bowman, Bryan] | Glen Helen Station | | | | 21 Dec 1961 - 15 Feb 1962 |
| item | GL 1884 | [Hamlyn, Jeffrey Alfred] | Tea-Tree | | | | 08 Mar 1962 - 23 Nov 1962 |
| item | GL 1895 | [Kenna, Leslie Joseph] | | | | | 13 Oct 1954 - 09 Feb 1967 |
| item | GL 1896 | Rawlins, Thomas Henry and Rawlins, Dorothy and Rawlins, Rosemary Dorothy | | | | | 01 Nov 1956 - 05 Jul 1966 |
| item | GL 1899 | Michael, I [Ian] D [Donovan] | | | | | 16 Aug 1957 - 23 Jun 1966 |
| item | GL 1915 | Anderson, A [Alexander] | Manners Creek Station | | | | 20 Mar 1964 - 05 Jan 1978 |
| item | GL 1920 | [Neutral Junction Proprietors] | Neutral Junction Station | | | | 03 Mar 1964 - 03 Jun 1964 |
| item | GL 1921 | [Anderson, Alexander] | Manners Creek | | | | 25 Jun 1964 - 26 Aug 1964 |
| item | GL 1924 | Bartlett, Cecil Annandale and Walsh, John Kerwick and Walsh, Pamella Ellen | Singleton Station | | | | 11 Aug 1964 - 14 Aug 1964 |
| item | GL 1925 | [New Crown Pastoral Company Limited] | | | | | 05 Oct 1961 - 18 Mar 1969 |
| item | GL 1928 | [Collings, Murray Kenneth] | | | | | 18 Aug 1964 - 30 Jun 1965 |
| item | GL 1933 | [Fogarty, EJ] | Mulga Park Station | | | | 15 Feb 1965 - 24 Mar 1965 |
| item | GL 1936 | [Paige, Kenneth Ian] | Plenty Downs | | | | 22 Jul 1964 - 23 Jun 1969 |
| item | GL 1939 | [Andado Pastoral Company Limited] | | | | | 16 Aug 1965 - 24 Aug 1965 |
| item | GL 1943 | [Gorey, Thomas Ernest] | Allambi Station | | | | 18 Oct 1965 - 04 Aug 1967 |
| item | GL 1958 | [Pye, David Ward] | Stirling Station | | | | 08 Dec 1966 - 12 Dec 1966 |
| item | GL 1960 | Morphett, Roy Reginald | | | | | 23 Sep 1964 - 04 Aug 1967 |
| item | GL 1966 | Cramer, G [Gilbert] R [Roland] and Cramer, M [Mona] E [Elizabeth] | | | | | 30 Jun 1967 - 08 Jul 1980 |
| item | GL 1978 | [Summers, George Carey Hourigan] | | | | | 11 Nov 1959 - 18 Sep 1973 |
| item | GL 1991 | [Davey, Catherine Eliza] | Singleton Station | | | | 07 Sep 1965 - 23 Jun 1971 |
| item | GL 1992 | [Davey, Catherine Eliza] | Singleton Station | | | | 13 Oct 1966 - 23 Jun 1971 |
| item | GL 1993 | [Timperon, John Lawence] | | | | | 27 May 1969 - 06 Oct 1972 |
| item | GL 2001 | [Harris, Reginald Robert] | McLaren Creek Station | | | | 24 Nov 1969 - 06 Sep 1972 |
| item | GL 2019 | Harris, R [Reginald] R [Robert] | McLaren Creek Station | | | | 07 Mar 1972 - 06 Nov 1974 |
| item | GL 2025 | Hagen, A [Allan] J [James] and Hagan, M [Miriam] A [ Ann] | Muckety Station | | | | 08 Nov 1972 - 08 Nov 1972 |
| item | GL 2028 | Bowman, Bryan | Coniston Station | | | | 18 Dec 1972 - 08 May 1974 |
| item | GL 2042 | Singleton Pastoral Company | | | | | 15 Jun 1971 - 30 Jun 1975 |
| item | GL 2043 | Singleton Pastoral Company | | | | | 15 Jun 1971 - 24 Jan 1978 |
| item | GL 2064 | Tennant CK [Creek] Past. [Pastoral] Co. [Company] | | | | | 26 Apr 1979 - 26 Apr 1979 |
| item | GL 2087 | Paech, H | | | | | 19 Dec 1979 - 07 Nov 1980 |